Heartland Bank v. First Capital Victoria LLC et al
Plaintiff: Heartland Bank
Defendant: First Capital Victoria LLC, RREAF Victoria LLC, First Capital Jourdanton LLC, RREAF Jourdanton LLC, First Capital Hobbs LLC, RREAF Hobbs LLC, First Capital Real Estate Investments LLC, First Capital Retail LLC, First Capital Real Estate Advisors LP, Suneet Singal, TCA Global Credit Master Fund LP, Brandon Keller and Ramesh Prasad
Case Number: 4:2017cv00549
Filed: August 29, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER granting as modified 115 Motion for attorney fees. Suneet Singal, First Capital Victoria, First Capital Jourdanton, First Capital Hobbs, and First Capital Real Estate Investments owe Simmons Bank a total of $82,073.80 more. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/6/2019. (jak)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 112 JUDGMENT: Simmons Bank shall have judgment against First Capital Victoria LLC for $5,985,241.98; Simmons Bank shall have judgment against First Capital Jourdanton LLC for $6,6880,964.86; Simmons Bank shall have judgment against First Capita l Hobbs LLC for $8,027,364.61; Simmons Bank shall have judgment against First Capital Real Estate Investments LLC for $14,908,329.47; Simmons Bank shall have judgment against Suneet Singal for $20,893,571.45; all claims against First Capital Retail LLC, RREAF Victoria LLC, RREAF Jourdanton LLC, RREAF Hobbs LLC, First Capital Real Estate Advisors LP, TCA Global Credit Master Fund LP, Brandon "Rocky" Kaller, and Ramesh Prasad are dismissed without prejudice; Counts III an d IV of the second amended complaint are dismissed without prejudice. Simmons Bank, Trustee of Heartland Bank Liquidating Trust U/I/D 3/8/2018, is entitled to seek allowable costs by motion due 4/5/2019. The amounts awarded in the Judgment shall bear post-judgment interest at 2.52% per annum until paid in full. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/21/2019. (kdr)
February 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER: Stipulation 77 noted. RREAF Victoria LLC, RREAF Hobbs LLC, RREAF Jourdanton LLC, TCA Global Credit Master Fund LP, Brandon "Rocky" Kaller, and Ramesh Prasad are dismissed without prejudice. The Court directs the Clerk to update the docket. Motions 17 , 61 , and 64 denied without prejudice as moot. 78 Motion to amend is granted. Second amended complaint due by 2/20/2018. 67 Motion to dismiss is denied without prejudice as moot. The 3/23/2018 hearing is cancelled. A Final Scheduling Order will issue. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/13/2018. (jak)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heartland Bank v. First Capital Victoria LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heartland Bank
Represented By: J. David Folsom
Represented By: William R. Jenkins, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Capital Victoria LLC
Represented By: Charles T. Coleman
Represented By: David Chan Jung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RREAF Victoria LLC
Represented By: Charles T. Coleman
Represented By: David Chan Jung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Capital Jourdanton LLC
Represented By: Charles T. Coleman
Represented By: David Chan Jung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RREAF Jourdanton LLC
Represented By: Charles T. Coleman
Represented By: David Chan Jung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Capital Hobbs LLC
Represented By: Charles T. Coleman
Represented By: David Chan Jung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RREAF Hobbs LLC
Represented By: Charles T. Coleman
Represented By: David Chan Jung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Capital Real Estate Investments LLC
Represented By: Charles T. Coleman
Represented By: David Chan Jung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Capital Retail LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Capital Real Estate Advisors LP
Represented By: Charles T. Coleman
Represented By: David Chan Jung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suneet Singal
Represented By: Charles T. Coleman
Represented By: David Chan Jung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TCA Global Credit Master Fund LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ramesh Prasad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?