Faber v. Munyun et al

Plaintiff: Robert Faber
Defendant: Monte Munyun, Brawley, Gary Andrews and Garry Stewart
Case Number: 4:2018cv00123
Filed: February 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Faulkner
Presiding Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 58 JUDGMENT: Consistent with 57 Order that was entered on this day, this case is hereby dismissed, without prejudice. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 2/28/2019. (ljb)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER approving and adopting 48 Partial Recommended Disposition as this Court's findings in all respects; granting 27 motion for partial summary judgment; and dismissing, without prejudice, Faber's state medical negligence claim against Clark Family Dentistry. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 2/5/2019. (ljb)
May 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER adopting in all respects in its entirety 12 the Partial Recommended Disposition; dismissing without prejudice Faber's claims against Defendants Andrews and Stewart; dismissing with prejudice his claims against Defendant Faulkner County J ail; and allowing Faber to proceed with deliberate-indifference claims against Defendants Munyan, Brawley, and Clark Family Dentistry, and with a medical malpractice claim against Clark Family Dentistry. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 5/8/2018. (kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Faber v. Munyun et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Faber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monte Munyun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brawley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garry Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?