Symphony Diagnostic Services No 1 LLC v. Kingery
Plaintiff: Symphony Diagnostic Services No 1 LLC
Defendant: Ryan Kingery, Does 1-10 and Clearview Digital Image LLC
Case Number: 4:2018cv00463
Filed: July 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: D P Marshall
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2018 Filing 12 Deficiency Letter from Clerk of Court notifying party that #11 Amended Complaint lacks an original signature (F.R.Cv.P. 11(a) and Local Rule 5.5(c)(1)). (jak)
September 4, 2018 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Ryan Kingery, and newly added defendants Clearview Digital Image LLC, and Does, filed by Symphony Diagnostic Services No 1 LLC (summons issued and given to plaintiff's attorney for service upon defendant Clearview Digial Image, LLC) (jap) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/7/2018: #1 Main Document - w/Signature) (thd).
September 4, 2018 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Symphony Diagnostic Services No 1 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Robinson, Spencer)
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: Unopposed motion, No. #8 , granted. Response due 4 September 2018. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/24/2018. (slb)
August 23, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Symphony Diagnostic Services No 1 LLC (Robinson, Spencer)
August 16, 2018 Filing 7 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Report due by 10/1/2018. Bench Trial set for 4/6/2020 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 1A before Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. Signed at the direction of the Court on 8/16/2018. (slb)
August 14, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily Christel Mizell on behalf of Ryan Kingery (Mizell, Emily)
August 14, 2018 Filing 5 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #4 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Ryan Kingery. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- 2015 Employment Agreement)(Kobbeman, Kerrilee)
August 14, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Ryan Kingery (Kobbeman, Kerrilee)
August 14, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Kerrilee Elizabeth Kobbeman on behalf of Ryan Kingery (Kobbeman, Kerrilee)
July 30, 2018 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT of Service , filed by Symphony Diagnostic Services No 1 LLC. Symphony Diagnostic Services No 1 LLC served on 7/24/2018. (Robinson, Spencer)
July 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ryan Kingery, filed by Symphony Diagnostic Services No 1 LLC. Fee of $400 paid. Receipt Number LIT067934. Summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Symphony Diagnostic Services No 1 LLC v. Kingery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Symphony Diagnostic Services No 1 LLC
Represented By: Spencer F. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Kingery
Represented By: Kerrilee Elizabeth Kobbeman
Represented By: Emily Christel Mizell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clearview Digital Image LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?