Wise et al v. Department of Transportation et al
Plaintiff: Uta Meyer, Robert Walker, George Wise, David Martindale and Matthew Pekar
Defendant: Department of Transportation, Arkansas Department of Transportation and Federal Highway Administration
Case Number: 4:2018cv00466
Filed: July 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Referring Judge: James M Moody
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 42:4321
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #20 Motion to Extend Time to file an Answer until September 17, 2018. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 8/20/2018. (sjh)
August 14, 2018 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Rita S. Looney on behalf of Arkansas Department of Transportation (Looney, Rita)
August 14, 2018 Filing 20 MOTION to Extend Time by Arkansas Department of Transportation (Umeda, Mark)
August 14, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Umeda on behalf of Arkansas Department of Transportation (Umeda, Mark)
August 13, 2018 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #18 TRANSCRIPT. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the description of the document filed as "EXCERPTED TRANSCRIPT" as marked on the document. (jak)
August 10, 2018 Filing 18 EXCERPTED TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing Proceedings held on July 23, 2018, before Judge James M. Moody Jr. Court Reporter - Margaret M. Kruse. Transcript may be viewed only at the public terminals in the Clerk's office. Copies of transcript are only available through the Official Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. DEADLINES: Notice of Intent to Request Redaction due 8/17/2018. Redaction Request due 8/31/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/10/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/8/2018. (mcz) (Docket text modified on 8/13/2018 to correct the description of the document filed) (jak)
July 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER denying #2 the request for injunctive relief. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 7/27/2018. (kdr)
July 23, 2018 Filing 16 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.)CLERK'S MINUTES for proceedings held before Judge James M. Moody Jr.:MOTION HEARING held on 7/23/2018 re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. Following witness testimony and argument from counsel, the Court takes matter under advisement. Counsel for Plaintiff - Richard Mays, Heather Zachary; Counsel for Federal Highway Administration - Stacey McCord, Shannon Smith, Scott Jones; Counsel for Arkansas Department of Transportation - Rita Looney (Court Reporter M. Kruse/K. Baker.) (kog)
July 23, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #14 Response. CORRECTION: The original document was submitted in error (wrong image file). The correct document was added to docket entry #14 based on the attached correspondence. (jak)
July 22, 2018 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 3, #3 Exhibit 4, #4 Exhibit 6, #5 Exhibit 7, #6 Exhibit 8, #7 Exhibit 10, #8 Exhibit 11)(Smith, Shannon) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/23/2018: #9 Main Document - Correct (submitted 7/23/2018)) (jak).
July 19, 2018 Filing 13 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE of Hearing on #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order: MOTION HEARING set for 7/23/2018 at 9:00 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 4A before Judge James M. Moody Jr. (kog)
July 19, 2018 Filing 12 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.)CLERK'S MINUTES for proceedings held before Judge James M. Moody Jr.:STATUS CONFERENCE held on 7/19/2018. Court determines a hearing on the Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order should be set for Monday, July 23, 2018 at 9:00am. Counsel for Plaintiff - Richard Mays, Heather Zachary; Counsel for Federal Highway Administration - Stacey McCord, Shannon Smith, Scott Jones, Gloria Hardiman; Counsel for Arkansas Department of Transportation - Rita Looney(Court Reporter J. Ammons.) (kog)
July 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER authorizing attending members of the media to a tape recorder into the courthouse for the hearing scheduled to begin 7/19/2018 at 2:45 pm. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 7/19/2018. (mcz)
July 19, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Stacey Elise McCord on behalf of Department of Transportation, Federal Highway Administration (McCord, Stacey)
July 19, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Shannon S. Smith on behalf of Department of Transportation, Federal Highway Administration (Smith, Shannon)
July 19, 2018 Filing 8 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE of Hearing: STATUS CONFERENCE set for 7/19/2018 at 2:45 PM in Little Rock Courtroom # 4A before Judge James M. Moody Jr. (kog)
July 19, 2018 Filing 7 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Based on #6 Order, the Clerk's office has reassigned the case to Judge James M. Moody Jr. (jak)
July 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT directing the Clerk's Office to issue a Notice of Reassignment. Signed at the direction of the Court on 7/19/2018. (cmn)
July 18, 2018 Filing 5 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Based on 3 Order, the Clerk's office has reassigned the case to Judge Kristine G. Baker. (kbc)
July 18, 2018 Filing 4 BRIEF IN SUPPORT of #2 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, and for Preliminary and Permanent Injunctions and Request for Expedited Hearing filed by All Plaintiffs. (ljb)
July 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER OF RECUSAL: I recuse from this case as I am presiding over a jury trial out of state. The Clerk of the Court is directed to reassign this case. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 7/18/18. (mmb)
July 18, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by All Plaintiffs. (ljb)
July 18, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT, FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND PRELIMINARY AND PERMANENT INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against All Defendants filed by Uta Meyer, Matthew Pekar, George Wise, David Martindale, Robert Walker. Summons issued and returned to counsel. (Fee of $400 paid, Receipt #LIT067998.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ljb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wise et al v. Department of Transportation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Uta Meyer
Represented By: Heather G. Zachary
Represented By: Richard H. Mays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Walker
Represented By: Heather G. Zachary
Represented By: Richard H. Mays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Wise
Represented By: Heather G. Zachary
Represented By: Richard H. Mays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Martindale
Represented By: Heather G. Zachary
Represented By: Richard H. Mays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Pekar
Represented By: Heather G. Zachary
Represented By: Richard H. Mays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Transportation
Represented By: Stacey Elise McCord
Represented By: Shannon S. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas Department of Transportation
Represented By: Rita S. Looney
Represented By: Mark Umeda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Highway Administration
Represented By: Stacey Elise McCord
Represented By: Shannon S. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?