Abram et al v. Seeco Inc et al
Plaintiff: Regina Iburg, Marvin Logan, Lisa Herring, Darrell Logan, Freddie Herring, Janet Carroll, Clarence Verlon Abram, Charles Smith, Frances H Swaffar, Marsha McCosh, Bonnie Johnston, Katheryn Harris, Sherry Logan, Randy Carroll, Wilma Dunham, Gerald Hayes, William Dunaway, Jr, Kenneth Fry, Davis Gullett, Jr, Stacy Coop, Alice Burns, Maurice Lipsey, Carol Wieland, Cary Shirley, Eva Nell Stroud, Eric Reaper, Brenda Shirley, Judy K English, Nancy Dunaway, Donald Brown, Donna Sue Lankford, Debbie Dean, William Fisher, Larry Iburg, Jo Ann Eubanks, Glenn George, Mary Katherine Brents, Lisa Fry, William Glenn, Felix Tharp, Robbie Parnell, Edwin Dunaway, James Latimer, Carolyn Bishop, Danyel Williams, Powderly Eubanks, Princess Tharp, Anne Fisher, Coralie Hawkins, James Gordon Crinklaw, Jr, James Ingram, Michael England, Hawks Crest Shoals LLC, Audrey Sue Baker, Kenneth Brents, Dorothy Knapp, William Burns, Shirley A Hughes, Wood Family Natural Resources, Joan Swaffar, Joe Thompson, Jr, Tina Reaper, Berlin Gary Jackson, Rita Galloway, Charles Douglas Wagner, Charles Swaffar, Lanita Ingram, Mary Alice Florida, Susan Gullett, Tommy Joe Davis, James Bishop, Marie George, Wayne Miller, Mary Kay Dunaway, Lynn Brown, James Dunham, Phyllis Herrin, Deborah England, Mary Thompson, Betty Rice, Catherine Wright, Tanscontinental Management & Marketing Group Inc, Larry Yarbrough, Albert F Russenberger, Rickey Harris, Lonnie Harris, Glenda Smith, Janan Day, Robert Herring, Beverly Glenn, Jo Ann Wood, Martha Mae Nelson, Richard Day, Sue Miller, Dave Herrin, Dwight Lankford, Cary Parnell, Floyd Dean, Jr, Linda Sue Harris, Estate of Carol Wieland, Transcontinental Management & Marketing Group Inc, Betty Jane Ring and Nell Stroud
Defendant: Southwestern Energy Company, Desoto Gathering Company LLC, SWN Energy Services Company LLC, Seeco Inc and SWN Production (Arkansas) LLC
Case Number: 4:2018cv00575
Filed: August 22, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: J Leon Holmes
Referring Judge: Brian S Miller
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2018 Filing 28 RESPONSE in Opposition re #20 MOTION for Sanctions filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Lipsey's Highlighted Royalty Statements, #2 Exhibit 2- Correspondence to Defense Counsel, #3 Exhibit 3- Joint Motion Filed in Snow)(Holton, Timothy)
October 17, 2018 Filing 27 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Based on #26 Order, the Clerk's office has reassigned the case to Chief Judge Brian S. Miller. (jak)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to reassign this case to the Honorable Brian Miller since he presided over a related case, Smith v. SEECO, Inc., 4:14-CV-00435-BSM. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 10/17/2018. (ljb)
October 16, 2018 Filing 25 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Based on #24 Order, the Clerk's office has reassigned the case to Judge Billy Roy Wilson. (jak)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER directing the Clerk to reassign the above styled case. Signed at the direction of the Court on 10/16/2018. (cmn)
October 16, 2018 Filing 23 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Based on #22 Order, the Clerk's office has reassigned the case to Judge Susan Webber Wright. (jak)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER directing the Clerk to assign this case to another judge. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 10/16/2018. (ljb)
October 3, 2018 Filing 21 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #20 Motion for Sanctions filed by All Defendants. (Perkins, G.)
October 3, 2018 Filing 20 MOTION for Sanctions by All Defendants (Perkins, G.)
September 26, 2018 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #19 Notice. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the description of the document filed as "SUPPLEMENT re #17 Reply to Response to Motion by Desoto Gathering Company LLC, SWN Energy Services Company LLC, Seeco Inc, Southwestern Energy Company" as marked on the document. (jak)
September 24, 2018 Filing 19 SUPPLEMENT re #17 Reply to Response to Motion by Desoto Gathering Company LLC, SWN Energy Services Company LLC, Seeco Inc, Southwestern Energy Company (Perkins, G.)(Docket text modified on 9/26/2018 to correct the description of the document filed)(jak)
September 13, 2018 Filing 18 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 10/30/2018. Rule 26(f) Report due by 11/13/2018. Proposed jury trial date the week of 7/8/2019 in Little Rock Courtroom #4D before Judge J. Leon Holmes. Signed at the direction of the Court. (cdw)
September 12, 2018 Filing 17 REPLY to Response to Motion re #3 MOTION to Dismiss filed by All Defendants. (Perkins, G.)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #12 , #13 , and #14 defendants' motions for admission to appear pro hac vice. Robert D. Woods, Robert K. Ellis, and R. Paul Yetter are admitted to appear as co-counsel for the defendants in this action. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/5/2018. (ljb)
September 5, 2018 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 Supplemental MOTION to Dismiss Supplement to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, #3 MOTION to Dismiss filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- DGC Motion to Intervene)(Holton, Timothy)
August 29, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by R. Paul Yetter. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3308017. Filed by All Defendants (Perkins, G.)
August 29, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Robert K. Ellis. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3308012. Filed by All Defendants (Perkins, G.)
August 29, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Robert Woods. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3307998. Filed by All Defendants (Perkins, G.)
August 29, 2018 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Southwestern Energy Company (Perkins, G.)
August 29, 2018 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by SWN Energy Services Company LLC (Perkins, G.)
August 29, 2018 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Seeco Inc (Perkins, G.)
August 29, 2018 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Desoto Gathering Company LLC (Perkins, G.)
August 27, 2018 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #7 Supplemental MOTION to Dismiss. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the filing event as "SUPPLEMENT re #3 Motion to Dismiss" as marked on the document.(jak)
August 24, 2018 Filing 7 SUPPLEMENT re #3 MOTION to Dismiss by All Defendants (Perkins, G.)(Docket text modified on 8/27/2018 to correct the filing event)(jak)
August 22, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Related Case by All Defendants; Case Number 4:16-cv-00149-JLH. (ljb)
August 22, 2018 Filing 5 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by All Defendants. (ljb)
August 22, 2018 Filing 4 BRIEF IN SUPPORT of #3 Motion to Dismiss filed by All Defendants. (ljb)
August 22, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss by All Defendants. (ljb)
August 22, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Exhibits Continued) (ljb)
August 22, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Faulkner County Circuit Court, Case Number 23CV-18-845. Fee of $400 paid, Receipt #LIT068469. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Removal Continued, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (ljb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abram et al v. Seeco Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regina Iburg
Represented By: B. Michael Easley
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: John R. Holton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marvin Logan
Represented By: B. Michael Easley
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: John R. Holton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Herring
Represented By: B. Michael Easley
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: John R. Holton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrell Logan
Represented By: B. Michael Easley
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: John R. Holton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Freddie Herring
Represented By: B. Michael Easley
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: John R. Holton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet Carroll
Represented By: B. Michael Easley
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: John R. Holton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clarence Verlon Abram
Represented By: B. Michael Easley
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: John R. Holton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Smith
Represented By: B. Michael Easley
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: John R. Holton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frances H Swaffar
Represented By: B. Michael Easley
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: John R. Holton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marsha McCosh
Represented By: B. Michael Easley
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: John R. Holton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bonnie Johnston
Represented By: B. Michael Easley
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: John R. Holton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katheryn Harris
Represented By: B. Michael Easley
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: John R. Holton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherry Logan
Represented By: B. Michael Easley
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: John R. Holton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy Carroll
Represented By: B. Michael Easley
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: John R. Holton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilma Dunham
Represented By: B. Michael Easley
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: John R. Holton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald Hayes
Represented By: B. Michael Easley
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: John R. Holton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Dunaway, Jr
Represented By: B. Michael Easley
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: John R. Holton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Fry
Represented By: B. Michael Easley
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: John R. Holton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Davis Gullett, Jr
Represented By: B. Michael Easley
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: John R. Holton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacy Coop
Represented By: B. Michael Easley
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: John R. Holton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alice Burns
Represented By: B. Michael Easley
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: John R. Holton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maurice Lipsey
Represented By: B. Michael Easley
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: John R. Holton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Wieland
Represented By: B. Michael Easley
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: John R. Holton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cary Shirley
Represented By: B. Michael Easley
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: John R. Holton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eva Nell Stroud
Represented By: B. Michael Easley
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: John R. Holton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Reaper
Represented By: B. Michael Easley
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: John R. Holton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Shirley
Represented By: B. Michael Easley
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: John R. Holton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy K English
Represented By: B. Michael Easley
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: John R. Holton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Dunaway
Represented By: B. Michael Easley
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: John R. Holton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Brown
Represented By: B. Michael Easley
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: John R. Holton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Sue Lankford
Represented By: B. Michael Easley
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: John R. Holton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debbie Dean
Represented By: B. Michael Easley
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: John R. Holton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Fisher
Represented By: B. Michael Easley
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: John R. Holton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Iburg
Represented By: B. Michael Easley
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: John R. Holton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jo Ann Eubanks
Represented By: B. Michael Easley
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: John R. Holton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenn George
Represented By: B. Michael Easley
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: John R. Holton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Katherine Brents
Represented By: B. Michael Easley
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: John R. Holton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Fry
Represented By: B. Michael Easley
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: John R. Holton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Glenn
Represented By: B. Michael Easley
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: John R. Holton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felix Tharp
Represented By: B. Michael Easley
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: John R. Holton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robbie Parnell
Represented By: B. Michael Easley
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: John R. Holton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edwin Dunaway
Represented By: B. Michael Easley
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: John R. Holton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Latimer
Represented By: B. Michael Easley
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: John R. Holton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn Bishop
Represented By: B. Michael Easley
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: John R. Holton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danyel Williams
Represented By: B. Michael Easley
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: John R. Holton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Powderly Eubanks
Represented By: B. Michael Easley
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: John R. Holton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Princess Tharp
Represented By: B. Michael Easley
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: John R. Holton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anne Fisher
Represented By: B. Michael Easley
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: John R. Holton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Coralie Hawkins
Represented By: B. Michael Easley
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: John R. Holton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Gordon Crinklaw, Jr
Represented By: B. Michael Easley
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: John R. Holton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Ingram
Represented By: B. Michael Easley
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: John R. Holton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael England
Represented By: B. Michael Easley
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: John R. Holton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hawks Crest Shoals LLC
Represented By: B. Michael Easley
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: John R. Holton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Audrey Sue Baker
Represented By: B. Michael Easley
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: John R. Holton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Brents
Represented By: B. Michael Easley
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: John R. Holton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorothy Knapp
Represented By: B. Michael Easley
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: John R. Holton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Burns
Represented By: B. Michael Easley
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: John R. Holton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley A Hughes
Represented By: B. Michael Easley
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: John R. Holton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wood Family Natural Resources
Represented By: B. Michael Easley
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: John R. Holton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joan Swaffar
Represented By: B. Michael Easley
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: John R. Holton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Thompson, Jr
Represented By: B. Michael Easley
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: John R. Holton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tina Reaper
Represented By: B. Michael Easley
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: John R. Holton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Berlin Gary Jackson
Represented By: B. Michael Easley
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: John R. Holton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rita Galloway
Represented By: B. Michael Easley
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: John R. Holton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Douglas Wagner
Represented By: B. Michael Easley
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: John R. Holton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Swaffar
Represented By: B. Michael Easley
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: John R. Holton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lanita Ingram
Represented By: B. Michael Easley
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: John R. Holton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Alice Florida
Represented By: B. Michael Easley
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: John R. Holton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Gullett
Represented By: B. Michael Easley
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: John R. Holton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tommy Joe Davis
Represented By: B. Michael Easley
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: John R. Holton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Bishop
Represented By: B. Michael Easley
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: John R. Holton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marie George
Represented By: B. Michael Easley
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: John R. Holton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne Miller
Represented By: B. Michael Easley
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: John R. Holton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Kay Dunaway
Represented By: B. Michael Easley
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: John R. Holton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynn Brown
Represented By: B. Michael Easley
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: John R. Holton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Dunham
Represented By: B. Michael Easley
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: John R. Holton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phyllis Herrin
Represented By: B. Michael Easley
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: John R. Holton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah England
Represented By: B. Michael Easley
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: John R. Holton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Thompson
Represented By: B. Michael Easley
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: John R. Holton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betty Rice
Represented By: B. Michael Easley
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: John R. Holton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine Wright
Represented By: B. Michael Easley
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: John R. Holton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tanscontinental Management & Marketing Group Inc
Represented By: B. Michael Easley
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: John R. Holton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Yarbrough
Represented By: B. Michael Easley
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: John R. Holton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert F Russenberger
Represented By: B. Michael Easley
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: John R. Holton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rickey Harris
Represented By: B. Michael Easley
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: John R. Holton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lonnie Harris
Represented By: B. Michael Easley
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: John R. Holton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenda Smith
Represented By: B. Michael Easley
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: John R. Holton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janan Day
Represented By: B. Michael Easley
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: John R. Holton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Herring
Represented By: B. Michael Easley
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: John R. Holton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beverly Glenn
Represented By: B. Michael Easley
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: John R. Holton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jo Ann Wood
Represented By: B. Michael Easley
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: John R. Holton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha Mae Nelson
Represented By: B. Michael Easley
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: John R. Holton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Day
Represented By: B. Michael Easley
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: John R. Holton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sue Miller
Represented By: B. Michael Easley
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: John R. Holton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dave Herrin
Represented By: B. Michael Easley
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: John R. Holton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dwight Lankford
Represented By: B. Michael Easley
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: John R. Holton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cary Parnell
Represented By: B. Michael Easley
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: John R. Holton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Floyd Dean, Jr
Represented By: B. Michael Easley
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: John R. Holton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Sue Harris
Represented By: B. Michael Easley
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: John R. Holton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Carol Wieland
Represented By: B. Michael Easley
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: John R. Holton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Transcontinental Management & Marketing Group Inc
Represented By: B. Michael Easley
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: John R. Holton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betty Jane Ring
Represented By: B. Michael Easley
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: John R. Holton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nell Stroud
Represented By: B. Michael Easley
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: John R. Holton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southwestern Energy Company
Represented By: R. Paul Yetter
Represented By: G. Alan Perkins
Represented By: Jeffrey Martin Swann
Represented By: Robert K. Ellis
Represented By: Robert D. Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Desoto Gathering Company LLC
Represented By: R. Paul Yetter
Represented By: G. Alan Perkins
Represented By: Jeffrey Martin Swann
Represented By: Robert K. Ellis
Represented By: Robert D. Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SWN Energy Services Company LLC
Represented By: R. Paul Yetter
Represented By: G. Alan Perkins
Represented By: Jeffrey Martin Swann
Represented By: Robert K. Ellis
Represented By: Robert D. Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seeco Inc
Represented By: R. Paul Yetter
Represented By: G. Alan Perkins
Represented By: Jeffrey Martin Swann
Represented By: Robert K. Ellis
Represented By: Robert D. Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SWN Production (Arkansas) LLC
Represented By: R. Paul Yetter
Represented By: G. Alan Perkins
Represented By: Jeffrey Martin Swann
Represented By: Robert K. Ellis
Represented By: Robert D. Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?