Johnson et al v. Deutsche Bank National Trust Company et al

Plaintiff: Drusella Johnson and Jerry Johnson
Defendant: Herb Miller, Deutsche Bank National Trust Company and New Century Mortgage Corporation
Case Number: 4:2018cv00582
Filed: August 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Brian S Miller
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2018 Filing 17 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #16 Response in Opposition to Motion, Claimant's (sic) First Motion and Objection to Removal and Demand to Remand to State Court Immediately filed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company. (Horton, Johnathan)
October 10, 2018 Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 MOTION to Remand to State Court Immediately and First Motion and Objection to Removal filed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Bankruptcy Petition, #2 Exhibit 2 - Joint Administration Order, #3 Exhibit 3 - Confirmation Order, #4 Exhibit 4 - Assignment of Mortgage)(Horton, Johnathan)
September 26, 2018 Filing 15 CLAIMANT'S First Motion and Objection to Removal and Demand to Remand to State Court Immediately by Jerry Johnson (jap)
September 14, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION to Quash Subpoena by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Subpoena, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal)(Horton, Johnathan)
September 13, 2018 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #11 Brief in Support. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the linkage to #10 Response. (jak)
September 13, 2018 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION for Order Defendant's Response In Opposition To Claimant's Motion and Mandatory Judicial Notice with Incorporated Brief filed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company. (Horton, Johnathan)
September 13, 2018 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION for Order Defendant's Response In Opposition To Motion and Notice Of Offer Of Tender By Jerry Johnson D/B/A, Claimant With Incorporated Brief filed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company. (Horton, Johnathan)
September 13, 2018 Filing 11 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #10 Response in Opposition to Claimant's First Motion for Payment on the Court filed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company. (Horton, Johnathan)(Docket text modified on 9/13/2018 to correct the linkage) (jak)
September 13, 2018 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 MOTION for Order Defendant's Response In Opposition To Claimant's First Motion for Payment on the Court filed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company. (Horton, Johnathan)
September 4, 2018 Filing 9 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #8 Motion to Dismiss filed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company. (Horton, Johnathan)
September 4, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Summons Served on DBNTC, #2 Exhibit B motion to dismiss, #3 Exhibit C Order of Dismisal, #4 Exhibit D Order of Dismissal)(Horton, Johnathan)
August 28, 2018 Filing 7 AMENDED ORDER GRANTING TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Signed by Pulaski County Circuit Court Judge on 8/14/2018. (kdr)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Signed by Pulaski County Circuit Court Judge on 8/14/2018. (kdr)
August 28, 2018 Filing 5 CLAIMANTS' Motion and Mandatory Judicial Notice by Drusella Johnson and Jerry Johnson. (kdr)
August 28, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION and Notice of Offer of Tender by Drusella Johnson and Jerry Johnson. (kdr)
August 28, 2018 Filing 3 CLAIMANTS' First Motion for Payment on the Court by Drusella Johnson and Jerry Johnson. (kdr)
August 28, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Drusella Johnson and Jerry Johnson.(kdr)
August 28, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company from Pulaski County Circuit Court, case number 60CV-18-4960. Fee of $400 paid. Receipt Number LIT068549. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson et al v. Deutsche Bank National Trust Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Herb Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Represented By: Johnathan D. Horton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Century Mortgage Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Drusella Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?