Shale Royalty LLC v. BHP Billiton Petroleum (Fayetteville) LLC et al
Plaintiff: Shale Royalty LLC
Defendant: BHP Billiton Petroleum (Fayetteville) LLC and SWN Production (Arkansas) LLC
Case Number: 4:2018cv00621
Filed: August 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2018 Filing 17 RESPONSE to Motion re #13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Shale Royalty LLC. (Murray, Elizabeth)
October 26, 2018 Filing 16 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Shale Royalty LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - First Chesapeake Assignment, #2 Exhibit 2 - First Overriding Royalty, #3 Exhibit 3 - Second Overriding Royalty, #4 Exhibit 4 - Second Chesapeake Assignment, #5 Exhibit 5 - Subject Wells)(Murray, Elizabeth)
October 16, 2018 Filing 15 AMENDED ANSWER to #1 Complaint, #12 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim , CROSSCLAIM against SWN Production (Arkansas) LLC by BHP Billiton Petroleum (Fayetteville) LLC (Pekron, Chad)
October 15, 2018 Filing 14 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #13 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by SWN Production (Arkansas) LLC. (Terry, Rex)
October 15, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by SWN Production (Arkansas) LLC (Terry, Rex)
October 15, 2018 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against BHP Billiton Petroleum (Fayetteville) LLC by SWN Production (Arkansas) LLC.(Terry, Rex)
October 15, 2018 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by BHP Billiton Petroleum (Fayetteville) LLC.(Pekron, Chad)
October 8, 2018 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service Amended Affidavit of Service, filed by Shale Royalty LLC. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - SWN Return Receipt, #2 Exhibit 2 - SWN Summons, #3 Exhibit 3 - BHP Return Receipt, #4 Exhibit 4 - BHP Summons)(Ashley, Joshua)
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #7 Motion to Extend Time. Separate Defendant SWN Production (Arkansas), LLC, f/k/a SEECO, Inc., has up to and including October 15, 2018 in which to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 09/19/2018. (jjb)
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer BHP Billiton Petroleum (Fayetteville) LLC answer due 10/15/2018. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 09/19/2018. (jjb)
September 19, 2018 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time by SWN Production (Arkansas) LLC (Terry, Rex)
September 12, 2018 Filing 6 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 11/20/2018; Rule 26(f) Report due by 12/4/2018; and Jury Trial set for 9/23/2019 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock, Arkansas Courtroom # A530 before Judge Susan Webber Wright. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 9/12/2018. (hml)
September 12, 2018 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service , filed by Shale Royalty LLC. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - SWN Return Receipt, #2 Exhibit 2 - SWN Summons, #3 Exhibit 3 - BHP Return Receipt, #4 Exhibit 4 - BHP Summons)(Ashley, Joshua)
September 8, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Ryan Younger on behalf of BHP Billiton Petroleum (Fayetteville) LLC (Younger, Robert)
September 8, 2018 Filing 3 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by BHP Billiton Petroleum (Fayetteville) LLC (Pekron, Chad)
September 6, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Lis Pendens by Shale Royalty LLC (Ashley, Joshua)
August 29, 2018 Filing 1 ORIGINAL COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Shale Royalty LLC against All Defendants. Fee $400. Receipt Number LIT068559. Summons issued and returned to counsel for service. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(cmn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shale Royalty LLC v. BHP Billiton Petroleum (Fayetteville) LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BHP Billiton Petroleum (Fayetteville) LLC
Represented By: Robert Ryan Younger
Represented By: Chad W. Pekron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SWN Production (Arkansas) LLC
Represented By: Rex M. Terry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shale Royalty LLC
Represented By: Joshua C. Ashley
Represented By: Christopher J. Heller
Represented By: Elizabeth Robben Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?