Graham v. Wells et al
Plaintiff: Cindy Graham
Defendant: Tony Thomas, Larry Laque, Marc F Stoll, Carol B Armitage, William G Laperch, Samuel E Beall, III, Walter L Turek, Jeannie H Diefenderfer, Bob Gunderman, Michael G Stoltz, Alan L Wells, Windstream Holdings Inc, Jeffrey T Hinson and Julie A Shimer
Consolidated Defendant: Kristi Moody
Consolidated Plaintiff: Larry Graham
Case Number: 4:2018cv00709
Filed: September 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: James M Moody
Referring Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Stipulation and Agreed Motion to Consolidate Actions, Appoint Lead Counsel, and Defer Response Deadlines. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 11/15/2018. (ljb)
November 14, 2018 Filing 7 STIPULATION and Agreed Motion to Consolidate Actions, Appoint Lead Counsel, and Defer Response Deadlines by Cindy Graham. (Poynter, Scott)
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 motion to admit counsel pro hac vice on behalf of Plaintiff. Geoffrey Johnson is hereby admitted to appear before this Court as co-counsel of record in this action. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 10/29/2018. (cmn)
October 24, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Geoffrey M. Johnson. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3339837. Filed by All Plaintiffs (Poynter, Scott)
October 2, 2018 Filing 4 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Based on #3 Order, the Clerk's office has reassigned the case to Judge James M. Moody Jr. (jak)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER directing the Clerk to transfer this action to the docket to U.S. District Judge James M. Moody, Jr. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 10/2/2018. (cel)
September 26, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Related Case by Cindy Graham; Case Number 4:18-cv-00202 Murray v. EarthLink et al. (Poynter, Scott)
September 26, 2018 Summons Issued as to Jeannie H Diefenderfer, Bob Gunderman, Walter L Turek, Alan L Wells, Windstream Holdings Inc and returned to counsel for service. (cmn)
September 26, 2018 Filing 1 VERIFIED STOCKHOLDER DERIVATIVE COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Cindy Graham against All Defendants. Fee $400. Receipt Number LIT068933. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(cmn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Graham v. Wells et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Laque
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marc F Stoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carol B Armitage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William G Laperch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel E Beall, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walter L Turek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeannie H Diefenderfer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bob Gunderman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael G Stoltz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan L Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Windstream Holdings Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey T Hinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie A Shimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cindy Graham
Represented By: Geoffrey M. Johnson
Represented By: Joseph Pettigrew
Represented By: Jonathan M. Zimmerman
Represented By: Scott E. Poynter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Kristi Moody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Larry Graham
Represented By: Scott E. Poynter
Represented By: Brian J. Robbins
Represented By: Stephen J. Oddo
Represented By: Ashley R. Rifkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?