Herron v Entergy Arkansas et al
Plaintiff: Lacole Herron
Defendant: Does 1-10, Experian Information Solutions Inc, International Computer Systems Inc, Entergy Services Inc, Entergy Corporation, Entergy Arkansas Inc, Equifax Inc and Trans Union LLC
Case Number: 4:2018cv00762
Filed: October 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Referring Judge: Brian S Miller
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1681
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER consolidating Case No. 4:18-cv-00762 with and into Herron v. Entergy Arkansas Inc., et al., Case No. 4:18-cv-00671 ; and directing all parties to make filings only in Case No. 4:18-cv-00671 going forward. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 10/30/2018. (kdr)
October 30, 2018 Cases associated. Create association to 4:18-cv-00671-BSM, per #88 Order. (kdr)
October 24, 2018 Filing 87 NOTICE of Appearance by Ralph D. Scott, III on behalf of Equifax Inc (Scott, Ralph)
October 24, 2018 Filing 86 NOTICE of Appearance by Roger D. Rowe on behalf of Equifax Inc (Rowe, Roger)
October 22, 2018 Filing 85 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Based on #84 Order, the Clerk's office has reassigned the case to Chief Judge Brian S. Miller. (jak)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER directing this case be transferred to the docket of Chief Judge Brian S. Miller as it is related to Herron v. Entergy Arkansas Inc, et al., Case No. 4:18-cv-00671-BSM; and directing the Clerk of the Court to make the necessary chip exchange to transfer this case. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 10/22/2018. (cmn)
October 15, 2018 Filing 83 Case electronically transferred in from District of Oklahoma Western; Case Number 5:17-cv-01103. Copy of transfer order, case file, and docket sheet received.
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #73 plaintiff's Motion to Reconsider Order Dismissing Entergy Defendants; Motion to Transfer Action to U.S.D.C. for the Eastern District of Arkansas; Specifically, the Court denies plaintiff's motion to reconsider its order dismissing the Entergy Defendants, but it grants plaintiff's motion to transfer this case and transfers this case to the Eastern District of Arkansas. Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 10/12/2018. (ks) [Transferred from okwd on 10/15/2018.]
October 11, 2018 Filing 81 AMENDED NOVEMBER STATUS & SCHEDULING CONFERENCE DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 10/30/2018 03:30 PM in Chambers before Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange. Status Report due by 10/23/2018. (ks) [Transferred from okwd on 10/15/2018.]
October 9, 2018 Filing 80 REPLY to Response to Motion re #73 MOTION to Vacate #60 Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Transfer Case to USDC for the Eastern District of Arkansas filed by All Plaintiffs. (Dell, Louis) [Transferred from okwd on 10/15/2018.]
October 4, 2018 Filing 79 RESPONSE to Motion re #73 MOTION to Vacate #60 Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Transfer Case to USDC for the Eastern District of Arkansas filed by Entergy Services Inc. (Moore, Sean) [Transferred from okwd on 10/15/2018.]
October 1, 2018 Filing 78 MINUTE ORDER shortening each defendant's time to file its response to plaintiff's Motion to Reconsider Order Dismissing Entergy Defendants; Motion to Transfer Action to U.S.D.C. for the Eastern District of Arkansas and ordering each defendant to file its response, if any, by Thursday, October 4, 2018. Additionally, any reply shall be filed by Tuesday, October 9, 2018. Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 10/1/2018. (ks) [Transferred from okwd on 10/15/2018.]
September 28, 2018 Filing 77 ENTER ORDER - The Status and Scheduling Conference set for Tuesday, October 2, 2018 at 3:20 p.m., before Judge Vicki Miles-LaGrange, in the above referenced case, is hereby stricken and CONTINUED to the Court' November Status & Scheduling Conference Docket. Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 9/28/2018. (ks) [Transferred from okwd on 10/15/2018.]
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER granting #75 defendant Experian Information Solution, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to Appear Telephonically at Scheduling Conference, provided Experian's local counsel appears in person at the Scheduling Conference. Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 9/27/2018. (ks) [Transferred from okwd on 10/15/2018.]
September 26, 2018 Filing 75 MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically at Scheduling Conference by Experian Information Solutions Inc. (Sun, Jennifer) [Transferred from okwd on 10/15/2018.]
September 25, 2018 Filing 74 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Lacole Herron. (Dell, Louis) [Transferred from okwd on 10/15/2018.]
September 23, 2018 Filing 73 MOTION to Vacate #60 Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION to Transfer Case to USDC for the Eastern District of Arkansas by Lacole Herron. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Exhibit 1 (complaint), #3 Exhibit 2 (Entry of Appearance), #4 Exhibit 3 (Ark. Secty State), #5 Proposed Order)(Dell, Louis) [Transferred from okwd on 10/15/2018.]
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER denying as moot #48 plaintiff's Motion for an Order Permitting Discovery to be Conducted Prior to the Court's Ruling on Pending FRCP 12(b) Motion (as more fully set out). Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 9/21/2018. (ks) [Transferred from okwd on 10/15/2018.]
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER granting #70 Defendant Trans Union, LLC.'s Motion for Leave to Appear at Rule 26 Scheduling Conference by Telephone, provided Trans Union's local counsel appears in person at the Scheduling Conference. Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 9/18/2018. (ks) [Transferred from okwd on 10/15/2018.]
September 17, 2018 Filing 70 MOTION for Leave to Appear at Rule 26 Scheduling Conference by Telephone by Trans Union LLC. (Wood, Lauren) [Transferred from okwd on 10/15/2018.]
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER granting #67 Plaintiff Lacole Herron's Motion for Leave to Appear at Rule 26 Scheduling Conference by Telephone, provided plaintiff's local counsel appears in person at the Scheduling Conference. Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 9/12/2018. (ks) [Transferred from okwd on 10/15/2018.]
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER granting #66 Defendant Equifax, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to Appear at Scheduling and Status Conference by Telephone, provided Equifax's local counsel appears in person at the Scheduling Conference. Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 9/12/2018. (ks) [Transferred from okwd on 10/15/2018.]
September 11, 2018 Filing 67 MOTION for Order Permitting Plaintiff's Counsel to Appear at Scheduling Conference by Telephone by Lacole Herron. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(Dell, Louis) [Transferred from okwd on 10/15/2018.]
September 11, 2018 Filing 66 MOTION for Leave to Appear at Rule 26 Scheduling Conference by Telephone by Equifax Inc. (Carter, Kendall) [Transferred from okwd on 10/15/2018.]
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER granting #64 Defendant International Computer Systems, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to Appear at Status and Scheduling Conference by Telephone. Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 9/11/2018. (ks) [Transferred from okwd on 10/15/2018.]
September 10, 2018 Filing 64 MOTION for Leave to Appear at Status and Scheduling Conference by Telephone by International Computer Systems Inc. (Bragalone, Robert) [Transferred from okwd on 10/15/2018.]
September 7, 2018 Filing 63 AMENDED OCTOBER STATUS & SCHEDULING CONFERENCE DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 10/2/2018 03:20 PM in Chambers before Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange. Status Report due by 9/25/2018. (ks) [Transferred from okwd on 10/15/2018.]
September 6, 2018 Filing 62 NOTICE of Change of Address by Robert A Bragalone (Bragalone, Robert) [Transferred from okwd on 10/15/2018.]
September 4, 2018 Filing 61 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange: Scheduling Conference held on 9/4/2018. The Court continues this matter to the Court's October 2018 Status and Scheduling Conference Docket. (ks) [Transferred from okwd on 10/15/2018.]
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting #32 defendants Entergy Arkansas, Inc., Entergy Services, Inc., and Entergy Corporation's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction (as more fully set out). Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 9/4/2018. (ks) [Transferred from okwd on 10/15/2018.]
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting #58 defendants' Motion for Leave to Appear Telephonically at Scheduling Conference, provided defendants' local counsel appears at the scheduling conference in person. Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 8/31/2018. (ks) [Transferred from okwd on 10/15/2018.]
August 30, 2018 Filing 58 MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically at Scheduling Conference by Entergy Arkansas Inc, Entergy Corporation, Entergy Services Inc. (Johnson, William) [Transferred from okwd on 10/15/2018.]
August 30, 2018 Filing 57 ENTRY of Appearance by Sean D Moore on behalf of Entergy Services Inc (Moore, Sean) [Transferred from okwd on 10/15/2018.]
August 28, 2018 Filing 56 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Defendants Entergy Arkansas Inc, Entergy Corporation, Entergy Services Inc. (Johnson, William) [Transferred from okwd on 10/15/2018.]
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER granting #53 and #54 Motions for Leave to Appear at Rule 26 Scheduling Conference by Telephone. Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 8/28/2018. (ks) [Transferred from okwd on 10/15/2018.]
August 27, 2018 Filing 54 MOTION for Leave to Appear at Rule 26 Scheduling Conference by Telephone by Trans Union LLC. (Wood, Lauren) [Transferred from okwd on 10/15/2018.]
August 27, 2018 Filing 53 MOTION for Leave to Appear at Rule 26 Scheduling Conference by Telephone by Equifax Inc. (Carter, Kendall) [Transferred from okwd on 10/15/2018.]
August 23, 2018 Filing 52 ENTRY of Appearance by Lauren M Wood on behalf of Trans Union LLC (Wood, Lauren) [Transferred from okwd on 10/15/2018.]
August 22, 2018 Filing 51 RESPONSE in Opposition re #48 MOTION for Discovery (Permission to conduct discovery pending hearing on Entergy defendant's 12(b) motion) filed by Entergy Arkansas Inc, Entergy Corporation, Entergy Services Inc. (Johnson, William) [Transferred from okwd on 10/15/2018.]
August 16, 2018 Filing 50 ENTRY of Appearance by Kendall W Carter on behalf of Equifax Inc (Carter, Kendall) [Transferred from okwd on 10/15/2018.]
August 15, 2018 Filing 49 MINUTE ORDER - On August 14, 2018, plaintiff filed a Motion For An Order Permitting Discovery To Be Conducted Prior To The Court's Ruling On Pending FRCP 12(b) Motion. In light of the nature of the motion, the Court hereby SHORTENS defendants' time to file their responses to this motion and ORDERS defendants to file their responses by August 22, 2018. Additionally, any reply shall be filed by August 24, 2018. Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 8/15/2018. (ks) [Transferred from okwd on 10/15/2018.]
August 14, 2018 Filing 48 MOTION for Discovery (Permission to conduct discovery pending hearing on Entergy defendant's 12(b) motion) by Lacole Herron. (Dell, Louis) [Transferred from okwd on 10/15/2018.]
August 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting #46 defendant Experian's Motion for Leave to Appear Telephonically at Scheduling Conference, provided Experian's local counsel appears in person at the Scheduling Conference. Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 8/9/2018. (ks) [Transferred from okwd on 10/15/2018.]
August 8, 2018 Filing 46 MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically at Scheduling Conference by Experian Information Solutions Inc. (Sun, Jennifer) [Transferred from okwd on 10/15/2018.]
July 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting #44 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Attorney Kendall W. Carter.Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 7/26/18. (kmt) [Transferred from okwd on 10/15/2018.]
July 24, 2018 Filing 44 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Kendall W. Carter Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1087-2742893 by Equifax Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Skinner, Maris) [Transferred from okwd on 10/15/2018.]
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting #42 plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Appear at Rule 26 Scheduling Conference by Telephone, provided that local counsel appears in person at the scheduling conference. Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 7/17/2018. (ks) [Transferred from okwd on 10/15/2018.]
July 16, 2018 Filing 42 MOTION for Leave to Appear at Scheduling Conference by Telephone by Lacole Herron. (Dell, Louis) [Transferred from okwd on 10/15/2018.]
July 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting #40 Defendant International Computer Systems, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to Appear at Rule 26 Scheduling Conference by Telephone on September 4, 2018 at 2:00 p.m. Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 7/9/2018. (ks) [Transferred from okwd on 10/15/2018.]
July 3, 2018 Filing 40 Defendant International Computer Systems, Inc.'s Motion for Leave To Appear At Rule 26 Scheduling Conference By Telephone by International Computer Systems Inc. (Bragalone, Robert) Modified on 7/9/2018 to correct title of document (ks). [Transferred from okwd on 10/15/2018.]
July 3, 2018 Filing 39 SEPTEMBER STATUS & SCHEDULING CONFERENCE DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 9/4/2018 02:00 PM in Chambers before Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange. Status Report due by 8/28/2018. (ks) [Transferred from okwd on 10/15/2018.]
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting #37 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lysbeth L George terminated. Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 1/30/2018. (ks) [Transferred from okwd on 10/15/2018.]
January 29, 2018 Filing 37 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and Notice of Substitution of Counsel by International Computer Systems Inc. (George, Lysbeth) [Transferred from okwd on 10/15/2018.]
January 25, 2018 Filing 36 ENTRY of Appearance by Robert A Bragalone on behalf of International Computer Systems Inc (Bragalone, Robert) [Transferred from okwd on 10/15/2018.]
January 16, 2018 Filing 35 RESPONSE in Support re #32 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Personal) and Brief in Support filed by Entergy Arkansas Inc, Entergy Corporation, Entergy Services Inc. (Moore, Sean) [Transferred from okwd on 10/15/2018.]
January 9, 2018 Filing 34 RESPONSE in Opposition re #32 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Personal) and Brief in Support filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Decl. Dell, #2 Affidavit Herron, #3 Exhibit 1: Entergy Website, #4 Exhibit 2: Entergy Letter 1-25-17, #5 Exhibit 3: Entergy Letter 2-10-17, #6 Exhibit 4:Entergy Letter 5-31-17, #7 Exhibit 5: Debt Collection Letter 7-7-17, #8 Request for Judicial Notice of Court Documents, #9 Exhibit 6: Okland Case, #10 Exhibit 7: Tucker Case)(Dell, Louis) [Transferred from okwd on 10/15/2018.]
December 22, 2017 Filing 33 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by International Computer Systems Inc.(George, Lysbeth) [Transferred from okwd on 10/15/2018.]
December 20, 2017 Filing 32 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Personal) and Brief in Support by Entergy Arkansas Inc, Entergy Corporation, Entergy Services Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Shannon Ryerson, #2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Pamela Timmons, #3 Exhibit 3 - Declaration of Tiffany Collins, #4 Exhibit 4 - Ark Response Entergy)(Johnson, William) [Transferred from okwd on 10/15/2018.]
December 15, 2017 Filing 31 ANSWER to Complaint and Defenses by Trans Union LLC.(Givens, Juston) [Transferred from okwd on 10/15/2018.]
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #29 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, provided that Mr. Moore submits an ECF registration form and files an entry of appearance consistent with LCvR 83.4 AND 83.2(g). Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 12/6/2017. (ks) [Transferred from okwd on 10/15/2018.]
December 4, 2017 Filing 29 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1087-2605612 by Entergy Arkansas Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Request for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Johnson, William) [Transferred from okwd on 10/15/2018.]
December 4, 2017 Filing 28 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Equifax Inc . (Skinner, Maris) [Transferred from okwd on 10/15/2018.]
December 4, 2017 Filing 27 FIRST ANSWER to Complaint and Defenses by Equifax Inc.(Skinner, Maris) [Transferred from okwd on 10/15/2018.]
December 4, 2017 Filing 26 ENTRY of Appearance by Maris A Skinner on behalf of Equifax Inc (Skinner, Maris) [Transferred from okwd on 10/15/2018.]
December 4, 2017 Filing 25 ENTRY of Appearance by Arthur F Hoge, III on behalf of Equifax Inc (Hoge, Arthur) [Transferred from okwd on 10/15/2018.]
November 28, 2017 Filing 24 ENTRY of Appearance by Jennifer Sun on behalf of Experian Information Solutions Inc (Sun, Jennifer) [Transferred from okwd on 10/15/2018.]
November 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #22 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Jennifer Sun is admitted to practice before this Court for the limited purpose of participating in this case on behalf of defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc., provided counsel submits an ECF registration form and files an entry of appearance, consistent with LCvR 83.4. Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 11/27/2017. (ks) [Transferred from okwd on 10/15/2018.]
November 22, 2017 Filing 22 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jennifer Sun Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1087-2599043 by Experian Information Solutions Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Request for Admission)(Goodman, Jimmy) [Transferred from okwd on 10/15/2018.]
November 20, 2017 Filing 21 ENTRY of Appearance by Erin L Gregory on behalf of Entergy Arkansas Inc, Entergy Corporation, Entergy Services Inc (Gregory, Erin) [Transferred from okwd on 10/15/2018.]
November 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #17 Defendants Entergy Arkansas, Inc., Entergy Service, Inc., and Entergy Corporation's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendants Entergy Arkansas, Inc., Entergy Services, Inc. and Entergy Corporations shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before December 20, 2017. Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 11/17/2017. (ks) [Transferred from okwd on 10/15/2018.]
November 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #11 the Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer and/or Otherwise Respond filed by International Computer Systems, Inc. dba First Collection Services. Defendant FCS shall file an answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint no later than December 22, 2017. Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 11/17/2017. (ks) [Transferred from okwd on 10/15/2018.]
November 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #8 Defendant Trans Union LLC's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Trans Union shall file its Answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint no later than December 15, 2017. Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 11/17/2017. (ks) [Transferred from okwd on 10/15/2018.]
November 17, 2017 Filing 17 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Entergy Arkansas Inc, Entergy Corporation, Entergy Services Inc. (Johnson, William) [Transferred from okwd on 10/15/2018.]
November 17, 2017 Filing 16 ENTRY of Appearance by William A Johnson on behalf of Entergy Arkansas Inc, Entergy Corporation, Entergy Services Inc (Johnson, William) [Transferred from okwd on 10/15/2018.]
November 17, 2017 Filing 15 ENTRY of Appearance by William A Johnson on behalf of Entergy Arkansas Inc, Entergy Corporation, Entergy Services Inc (Johnson, William) [Transferred from okwd on 10/15/2018.]
November 16, 2017 Filing 14 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Experian Information Solutions Inc . (Goodman, Jimmy) [Transferred from okwd on 10/15/2018.]
November 16, 2017 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint by Experian Information Solutions Inc.(Goodman, Jimmy) [Transferred from okwd on 10/15/2018.]
November 16, 2017 Filing 12 ENTRY of Appearance by Jimmy K Goodman on behalf of Experian Information Solutions Inc (Goodman, Jimmy) [Transferred from okwd on 10/15/2018.]
November 16, 2017 Filing 11 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time To File Answer And/Or Otherwise Respond by International Computer Systems Inc. (George, Lysbeth) [Transferred from okwd on 10/15/2018.]
November 16, 2017 Filing 10 ENTRY of Appearance by Lysbeth L George on behalf of International Computer Systems Inc (George, Lysbeth) [Transferred from okwd on 10/15/2018.]
November 14, 2017 Filing 9 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by Trans Union LLC . (Givens, Juston) [Transferred from okwd on 10/15/2018.]
November 14, 2017 Filing 8 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Trans Union LLC. (Givens, Juston) [Transferred from okwd on 10/15/2018.]
November 14, 2017 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Juston R Givens on behalf of Trans Union LLC (Givens, Juston) [Transferred from okwd on 10/15/2018.]
October 24, 2017 Filing 6 Summons Issued Electronically as to Entergy Arkansas Inc, Entergy Corporation, Entergy Services Inc, Equifax Inc, Experian Information Solutions Inc, International Computer Systems Inc, Trans Union LLC. (ac) [Transferred from okwd on 10/15/2018.]
October 17, 2017 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Louis P Dell on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Dell, Louis) [Transferred from okwd on 10/15/2018.]
October 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Louis P. Dell may appear in this case pro hac vice on behalf of the plaintiff, provided that Louis P. Dell submits his ECF registration form and files an entry of appearance, consistent with LCvR 83.4. Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 10/13/2017. (ks) [Transferred from okwd on 10/15/2018.]
October 12, 2017 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1087-2573541 by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Dell, Brian) [Transferred from okwd on 10/15/2018.]
October 12, 2017 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Brian M Dell on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Dell, Brian) [Transferred from okwd on 10/15/2018.]
October 12, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Does, Entergy Arkansas Inc, Entergy Corporation, Entergy Services Inc, Equifax Inc, Experian Information Solutions Inc, International Computer Systems Inc, Trans Union LLC filed by Lacole Herron. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ac) [Transferred from okwd on 10/15/2018.]
October 12, 2017 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2573528. (Dell, Brian) [Transferred from okwd on 10/15/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Herron v Entergy Arkansas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions Inc
Represented By: Jennifer Sun
Represented By: Jimmy K. Goodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Computer Systems Inc
Represented By: Robert A. Bragalone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Entergy Services Inc
Represented By: Erin L O'Roke
Represented By: Sean D. Moore
Represented By: William A. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Entergy Corporation
Represented By: Erin L O'Roke
Represented By: William A. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Entergy Arkansas Inc
Represented By: Erin L O'Roke
Represented By: William A. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Inc
Represented By: Maris A. Skinner
Represented By: Arthur F Hoge, III
Represented By: Kendall W. Carter
Represented By: Roger D. Rowe
Represented By: Ralph D. Scott, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union LLC
Represented By: Lauren M. Wood
Represented By: Juston R. Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lacole Herron
Represented By: Brian Maurice Dell
Represented By: Louis P. Dell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?