Goodson et al v. Republican State Leadership Committee-Judicial Fairness Initiative

Plaintiff: Courtney Goodson and Courtney Goodson Campaign
Defendant: Republican State Leadership Committee-Judicial Fairness Initiative
Case Number: 4:2018cv00791
Filed: October 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
0 Judge: Brian S Miller
1 Judge: Billy Roy Wilson
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 JUDGMENT: Consistent with #21 order entered on this day, this case is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 11/15/2018. (kdr)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: Pursuant to #20 plaintiffs' notice of dismissal, this case is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 11/15/2018. (kdr)
November 15, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Courtney Goodson Campaign, Courtney Goodson (Hoover, Lauren)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER denying #2 plaintiffs' motion for a preliminary injunction. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 11/1/2018. (ljb)
October 31, 2018 Filing 18 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.)Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Brian S. Miller:Hearing re: preliminary injunction held on 10/31/2018. Testimony of Sarah Drye, Danielle Walker, and Courtney Goodson. Plaintiff's exhibits 1-15 admitted; defendant's exhibits 1-11 admitted. Matter taken under advisement. Lauren Hoover present for the plaintiff. John Tull, Thomas Keller, and Vincent Chadick present for the defendant. (Court Reporter Margie Kruse.) (lp)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER authorizing Lauren Hoover, Vincent Chadick, Thomas Keller, and John Tull to bring electronic devices into the Richard Shepard Arnold United States Courthouse in Little Rock on Wednesday, 10/31/2018. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 10/30/2018. (kdr)
October 30, 2018 Filing 16 RETURN OF SERVICE upon Danyelle Walker, RRT re Subpoena to Appear and Testify onOctober 30, 2018. (Hoover, Lauren)
October 30, 2018 Filing 15 STIPULATION Regarding the Admissibility of Exhibits by Republican State Leadership Committee-Judicial Fairness Initiative. (Keller, Thomas)
October 30, 2018 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re 12 Notice of Hearing on Motion. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to indicate the docket entry is a text entry only pursuant to instruction from Chambers. (jak)
October 30, 2018 Filing 14 RETURN OF SERVICE upon Sarah Drye, Resident Agent re Subpoena to Appear and Testify onOctober 29, 2018. (Hoover, Lauren)
October 29, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #2 Verified Complaint. CORRECTION: The original document was attached to the docket in error (incomplete image file) due to a clerical mistake by the Clerk's office. The complete document was added as an attachment to docket entry #2 and is attached hereto for review by the parties. (thd)
October 29, 2018 Filing 12 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE of Hearing on Motion. Motion Hearing set for 10/31/2018 at 09:00 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 2D before Chief Judge Brian S. Miller. (lp) (Docket text modified on 10/30/2018 to indicate the entry is a text entry only) (jak)
October 29, 2018 Filing 11 TRIAL BRIEF in Opposition to Request for Preliminary Injunction by Republican State Leadership Committee-Judicial Fairness Initiative(Keller, Thomas)
October 29, 2018 Filing 10 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Based on #9 Order, the Clerk's office has reassigned the case to Chief Judge Brian S. Miller. (jak)
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER directing the Clerk to reassign the above styled case. Signed at the direction of the Court on 10/29/2018. (cmn)
October 29, 2018 Filing 8 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Based on #7 Order, the Clerk's office has reassigned the case to Judge Susan Webber Wright. (jak)
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER recusing from this case. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 10/29/2018. (ljb)
October 29, 2018 Filing 6 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Based on #5 Order, the Clerk's office has reassigned the case to Judge James M. Moody Jr. (jak)
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER of recusal. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 10/29/2018. (ljb)
October 26, 2018 Filing 4 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 1/3/2019. Rule 26(f) Report due by 1/17/2019. Jury Trial set for 10/22/2019 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # A401 before Judge Billy Roy Wilson. Entered at the direction of the Court on 10/26/18. (mmb)
October 26, 2018 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #3 Preliminary Injunction Order. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to indicate the document was filed in error, based on a clerical mistake by the Clerk's office. (thd)
October 26, 2018 Filing 3 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - DISREGARD (wrong case). (ljb) (Docket text modified on 10/26/2018.) (thd).
October 26, 2018 Filing 2 VERIFIED COMPLAINT AND REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION with Jury Demand against Republican State Leadership Committee-Judicial Fairness Initiative filed by Courtney Goodson, Courtney Goodson Campaign. (ljb) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/29/2018: #1 Main Document - Correct) (thd).
October 26, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Republican State Leadership Committee-Judicial Fairness Initiative from Pulaski County Circuit Court, Case Number 60CV-18-7425. Fee of $400 paid, Receipt #LIT069342. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ljb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goodson et al v. Republican State Leadership Committee-Judicial Fairness Initiative
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Republican State Leadership Committee-Judicial Fairness Initiative
Represented By: Thomas Christoph Keller
Represented By: Vincent O. Chadick
Represented By: John E. Tull, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Courtney Goodson
Represented By: Lauren White Hoover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Courtney Goodson Campaign
Represented By: Lauren White Hoover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?