KBX Inc v. Gavilon Grain LLC et al

Appellee: M Randy Rice and Gavilon Grain LLC
In Re: Turner Grain Merchandising Inc
Appellant: KBX Inc
Case Number: 4:2018cv00839
Filed: November 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: D P Marshall
Referring Judge: Brian S Miller
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: Unopposed motion, No. #10 , granted. Appellee's brief due by 21 January 2019. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/20/2018. (slb)
December 19, 2018 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time by Gavilon Grain LLC (Stone, Clayborne)
December 13, 2018 Filing 9 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Based on #8 Order, the Clerk's office has reassigned the case to Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. (jak)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER reassigning this case to Judge D.P. Marshall because it is related to case number 2:17-CV-00040-DPM, which is assigned to Judge Marshall. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 12/13/2018. (kdr)
December 5, 2018 Filing 7 Appellant's BRIEF by KBX Inc. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Part 1A, #2 Appendix Part 1, #3 Appendix Part 2, #4 Appendix Part 3, #5 Appendix Part 4, #6 Appendix Part 5, #7 Appendix Part 6, #8 Appendix Part 7, #9 Appendix Part 8, #10 Appendix Part 9)(Davidson, Kate)
November 21, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Related Case by KBX Inc; Case Number 2:17-cv-00040-DPM (Poynter, Scott)
November 21, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE by KBX Inc of Designation of the Record and Statement of Issues to be Presented (Davidson, Kate)
November 21, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE by KBX Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit)(Davidson, Kate)
November 19, 2018 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #2 Scheduling Notice. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to indicate "Appellee's brief is due 30 days after service of Appellant's brief" as stated in the Notice.(thd)
November 14, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing of Transcript of Hearing on 4/26/2018 from the U.S. Bankruptcy Court Eastern District of Arkansas. (cmn)
November 13, 2018 Filing 2 SCHEDULING NOTICE (BANKRUPTCY APPEALS) Appellant's Brief due by 12/9/2018. Appellee's brief is due 30 days after service of Appellant's brief. Signed at the Direction of the Court. (cmn) (Docket text modified on 11/19/2018 to correct the deadline for Appellee's brief.)(thd).
November 9, 2018 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT transferred from the U.S. Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit. Bankruptcy Court case number 2:14-bk-15687. File received, filed by KBX Inc (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal, #2 Election for Appeal, #3 Bankrupty Docket Report, #4 USCA Docket Report, #5 Bk Dkt.#859 Order, #6 Bk Dkt.#744, #7 Bk Dkt.#844, #8 Transmittal Letter)(cmn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KBX Inc v. Gavilon Grain LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: M Randy Rice
Represented By: Hamilton Moses Mitchell
Represented By: M. Randy Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Gavilon Grain LLC
Represented By: Lance R. Miller
Represented By: Clayborne S. Stone
Represented By: Stanley Dale Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Turner Grain Merchandising Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: KBX Inc
Represented By: James M. McHaney, Jr.
Represented By: Kate Davidson
Represented By: Scott E. Poynter
Represented By: Ernest H. Harper, Jr.
Represented By: Randy Lee Grice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?