Smith v. Southern Service Systems Inc
Plaintiff: Brittany N Smith
Defendant: Southern Service Systems Inc
Case Number: 4:2018cv00853
Filed: November 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Billy Roy Wilson
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2018 Filing 6 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 3/6/2019. Rule 26(f) Report due by 3/20/2019. Jury Trial set for 12/17/2019 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # A401 before Judge Billy Roy Wilson. Entered at the direction of the Court on 12/27/18. (mmb)
December 27, 2018 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Southern Service Systems Inc (Strange, Sam)
December 27, 2018 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Southern Service Systems Inc.(Strange, Sam)
December 27, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Sam P. Strange, Jr on behalf of Southern Service Systems Inc (Strange, Sam)
December 18, 2018 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint , filed by Brittany N Smith. Southern Service Systems Inc served on 12/9/2018. (McGaha, Corey)
November 15, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Southern Service Systems Inc filed by Brittany N Smith. Summons issued and returned to counsel. (Fee of $400 paid, Receipt #LIT069643.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ljb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Southern Service Systems Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brittany N Smith
Represented By: William Thomas Crowder
Represented By: Corey Darnell McGaha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Service Systems Inc
Represented By: Sam P. Strange, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?