Jordan v. Pulaski County Detention Facility et al

Plaintiff: Oliver Lamont Jordan
Defendant: Pulaski County Detention Facility, Does Intake Nurses and Johnson
Case Number: 4:2018cv00879
Filed: November 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
0 Judge: Beth Deere
1 Judge: James M Moody
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER re #10 Mail Returned. If Mr. Jordan wants to continue with this lawsuit, he must notify the Court of his current address within 30 days of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 1/23/2019. (csf)
January 17, 2019 Filing 10 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Oliver Lamont Jordan re #8 Objection to Partial Recommended Disposition, #9 Order approving and adopting Recommendation. (fjg)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER approving and adopting #7 Recommendation as this Court's findings in all respects; dismissing, with prejudice, Mr. Jordan's claims against Defendant Pulaski County Regional Detention Facility; and instructing the Clerk to terminate the Detention Facility as a party Defendant. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 1/8/2019. (ljb)
January 7, 2019 Filing 8 OBJECTION to #7 Partial Recommended Disposition by Oliver Lamont Jordan. (ljb)
December 27, 2018 Summons Issued as to Johnson and forwarded to the U.S. Marshal for service. (jbh)
December 27, 2018 Filing 7 PARTIAL RECOMMENDED DISPOSITION recommending that Mr. Jordan's claims against the Pulaski County Detention Facility be dismissed, with prejudice. Objections due within 14 days of this Recommendation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 12/27/2018. (csf)
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER finding service is now proper for Defendant Johnson; directing the Clerk of Court to prepare a summons for Defendant Johnson; and directing the U.S. Marshal to serve copies of the #2 Complaint and #5 Amended Complaint without requiring prepayment of fees and costs or security. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 12/27/2018. (jbh)
December 12, 2018 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Oliver Lamont Jordan. (llg)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER directing Mr. Jordan to file an amended complaint within 30 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 12/4/2018. (cmn)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONER-PLAINTIFFS granting #1 IFP motion; directing monthly payments be made from Plaintiff's prison trust account for the $350 filing fee; and directing the Clerk of the Court to send a copy of this Order to the ADC Trust Fund Centralized Banking Office, the ADC Compliance Division, and the Warden of the Delta Regional Unit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 11/29/2018. (cmn)
November 26, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Oliver Lamont Jordan.(jak)
November 26, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Oliver Lamont Jordan. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jordan v. Pulaski County Detention Facility et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pulaski County Detention Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does Intake Nurses
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oliver Lamont Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?