Kenney v. Board of Trustees of University of Arkansas
Plaintiff: Kimberly Kenney
Defendant: Board of Trustees of University of Arkansas
Case Number: 4:2018cv00882
Filed: November 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2018 Filing 5 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 2/26/2019; Rule 26(f) Report due by 3/12/2019; Jury Trial set for sometime during the week of 2/3/2020 at 09:00 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 4C before Judge Kristine G. Baker. Signed at the direction of the Court on 12/28/2018. (tmw)
December 18, 2018 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Board of Trustees of University of Arkansas.(James, Sarah)
December 18, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Lewis James on behalf of Board of Trustees of University of Arkansas (James, Sarah)
December 6, 2018 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT of Service , filed by Kimberly Kenney. Kimberly Kenney served on 11/28/2018. (Campbell, Sheila)
November 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Kimberly Kenney against Board of Trustees of University of Arkansas. Fee $400. Receipt Number LIT069748. Summons issued and returned to counsel for service. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(cmn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kenney v. Board of Trustees of University of Arkansas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Kenney
Represented By: Sheila F. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Trustees of University of Arkansas
Represented By: Sarah Lewis James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?