Thompson v. DiMichele Enterprises Inc et al

Plaintiff: Jim Thompson
Defendant: DiMichele Enterprises Inc, Nicole DiMichele and Dean DiMichele
Case Number: 4:2018cv00903
Filed: December 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Billy Roy Wilson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER denying without prejudice #10 Plaintiff's motion. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 1/28/2019. (ljb)
January 24, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Certify Class , for Disclosure of Contact Information, and to Send Notices filed by All Defendants. (Vandiver, Brian)
January 21, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Dean DiMichele, Nicole DiMichele, DiMichele Enterprises Inc.(Vandiver, Brian)
January 16, 2019 Filing 11 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #10 Motion to Certify Class, for Disclosure of Contact Information, and to Send Notices filed by Jim Thompson. (Sanford, Joshua)
January 16, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Certify Class , for Disclosure of Contact Information, and to Send Notices by Jim Thompson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Sanford, Joshua)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting Defendants' #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Accordingly, Defendants' answer or responsive pleading must be filed by 5 p.m., Monday January 21, 2019. The statute of limitations will be tolled for 14 days, the length of the extension. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 01/08/19. (dmm)
January 8, 2019 Filing 8 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 3/18/2019. Rule 26(f) Report due by 4/1/2019. Bench Trial set for 1/7/2020 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # A401 before Judge Billy Roy Wilson. Entered at the direction of the Court on 1/8/19. (mmb)
January 7, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE to Motion re #6 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint filed by Jim Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Sanford, Joshua)
January 7, 2019 Filing 6 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Vandiver, Brian)
January 7, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Anthony Vandiver on behalf of All Defendants (Vandiver, Brian)
December 18, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jim Thompson. Dean DiMichele served on 12/15/2018; Nicole DiMichele served on 12/15/2018; DiMichele Enterprises Inc served on 12/12/2018. (Sanford, Joshua)
December 5, 2018 Filing 3 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Based on #2 Order, the Clerk's office has reassigned the case to Judge Billy Roy Wilson. (jak)
December 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER directing the Clerk to reassign the above styled case. Signed at the direction of the Court on 12/5/2018. (cmn)
December 5, 2018 Filing 1 ORIGINAL COMPLAINT-CLASS AND COLLECTIVE ACTION filed by Jim Thompson against All Defendants. Fee $400. Receipt Number LIT069900. Summons issued and returned to counsel for service. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(cmn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thompson v. DiMichele Enterprises Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DiMichele Enterprises Inc
Represented By: Brian Anthony Vandiver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicole DiMichele
Represented By: Brian Anthony Vandiver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dean DiMichele
Represented By: Brian Anthony Vandiver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jim Thompson
Represented By: Christopher Wesley Burks
Represented By: Joshua Sanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?