CHMS Provider's Association of Arkansas et al v. Gillespie et al
Plaintiff: CHMS Provider's Association of Arkansas, Cody Martin, Latoya Bryant, Lynn Sebastian, Ron Crunk, Michelle Edwards, Deidre Banks, Developmental Disabilities Provider Association and Darlene Sanders
Defendant: Cindy Gillespie and Melissa Stone
Case Number: 4:2018cv00908
Filed: December 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12131
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 parties' motion to withdraw motion for preliminary injunction without prejudice and for other relief; dismissing without prejudice #2 plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction; removing this case from the Court's active docket until further order of the Court or upon motion by either party; releasing the parties from the deadlines set by #4 Court's Order from 12/11/2018, until further order of the Court; and retaining jurisdiction over compliance with the terms of the parties' agreement. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 12/21/2018. (cmn)
December 21, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Suba Sruti K. Desikan on behalf of All Defendants (Desikan, Suba)
December 21, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to Withdraw #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction without prejudice by All Plaintiffs (Bowen, Martin)
December 21, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Neil Rosen on behalf of All Defendants (Rosen, Richard)
December 20, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathryn Loyd Wilson on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Wilson, Kathryn)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER setting a hearing on #2 pending preliminary injunction motion for Thursday, 12/27/2018 at 8:30 AM and continuing thereafter day-to-day until concluded; setting briefing schedule, witness and exhibits, and discovery deadlines; and directing the Clerk of Court to send a copy of this Order to David Sterling and Rich Rosen, from ADHS, via CM/ECF. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 12/11/2018. (cmn)
December 10, 2018 Summons Issued and returned to counsel for plaintiffs for service as to defendants Cindy Gillespie, Melissa Stone.(jap)
December 7, 2018 Filing 3 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #2 Motion for Emergency Injunctive Relief filed by All Plaintiffs. (cmn)
December 7, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by All Plaintiffs. (cmn)
December 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Deidre Banks, Ron Crunk, Lynn Sebastian, Michelle Edwards, Darlene Sanders, CHMS Provider's Association of Arkansas, Cody Martin, Latoya Bryant, and Developmental Disabilities Provider Association against All Defendants. Fee $400. Receipt Number LIT069942. No summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(cmn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CHMS Provider's Association of Arkansas et al v. Gillespie et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHMS Provider's Association of Arkansas
Represented By: David Lawrence Ivers
Represented By: Martin Wayne Bowen
Represented By: Clayton R. Blackstock
Represented By: Kathryn Loyd Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cody Martin
Represented By: David Lawrence Ivers
Represented By: Martin Wayne Bowen
Represented By: Clayton R. Blackstock
Represented By: Kathryn Loyd Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latoya Bryant
Represented By: David Lawrence Ivers
Represented By: Martin Wayne Bowen
Represented By: Clayton R. Blackstock
Represented By: Kathryn Loyd Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynn Sebastian
Represented By: David Lawrence Ivers
Represented By: Martin Wayne Bowen
Represented By: Clayton R. Blackstock
Represented By: Kathryn Loyd Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ron Crunk
Represented By: David Lawrence Ivers
Represented By: Martin Wayne Bowen
Represented By: Clayton R. Blackstock
Represented By: Kathryn Loyd Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Edwards
Represented By: David Lawrence Ivers
Represented By: Martin Wayne Bowen
Represented By: Clayton R. Blackstock
Represented By: Kathryn Loyd Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deidre Banks
Represented By: David Lawrence Ivers
Represented By: Martin Wayne Bowen
Represented By: Clayton R. Blackstock
Represented By: Kathryn Loyd Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Developmental Disabilities Provider Association
Represented By: David Lawrence Ivers
Represented By: Martin Wayne Bowen
Represented By: Clayton R. Blackstock
Represented By: Kathryn Loyd Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darlene Sanders
Represented By: David Lawrence Ivers
Represented By: Martin Wayne Bowen
Represented By: Clayton R. Blackstock
Represented By: Kathryn Loyd Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cindy Gillespie
Represented By: Richard Neil Rosen
Represented By: Suba Sruti K. Desikan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa Stone
Represented By: Richard Neil Rosen
Represented By: Suba Sruti K. Desikan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?