Derden v. General Revenue Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Ray Derden
Defendant: Does 1-10, inclusive and General Revenue Corporation
Case Number: 4:2018cv00909
Filed: December 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Ray Derden. (Lemberg, Sergei)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 motion for admission pro hac vice of attorney Brian D. Roth filed by separate defendant General Revenue Corporation. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 1/16/2019. (jbh)
January 11, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Brian D. Roth. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3383724. Filed by General Revenue Corporation (McPherson, Keith)
January 7, 2019 Filing 7 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 3/5/2019; Rule 26(f) Report due by 3/19/2019; Jury Trial set for sometime during the week of 1/27/2020 at 09:00 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 4C before Judge Kristine G. Baker. Signed at the direction of the Court on 01/07/2019. (tmw)
January 4, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by General Revenue Corporation (McPherson, Keith)
January 4, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by General Revenue Corporation.(McPherson, Keith)
December 28, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ray Derden. (Lemberg, Sergei)
December 27, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ray Derden. General Revenue Corporation served on 12/20/2018. (Lemberg, Sergei)
December 10, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #1 Complaint. CORRECTION: The civil cover sheet was not added as an attachment to docket entry #1 due to a Clerical mistake by the Clerk's office. The civil cover sheet was added to docket entry #1 and is attached hereto for review by the parties. (jak)
December 10, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Ray Derden against All Defendants. Fee $400. Receipt Number LIT069973. Summons issued and returned to counsel for service. (cmn) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/10/2018: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jak).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Derden v. General Revenue Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Revenue Corporation
Represented By: Brian D. Roth
Represented By: Keith Martin McPherson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ray Derden
Represented By: Sergei Lemberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?