Foster v. Esper

Plaintiff: Charles A Foster
Defendant: Department of the Army
Case Number: 4:2018cv00918
Filed: December 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Brian S Miller
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Jamie Goss Dempsey on behalf of Department of the Army (Dempsey, Jamie)
December 21, 2018 Filing 12 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER:Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 2/26/2019. Rule 26(f) Report due by 3/12/2019. Jury Trial set for sometime during the week of 10/7/2019 at 09:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 2D before Chief Judge Brian S. Miller. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 12/21/18. (lp)
December 12, 2018 *** Removed Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney from referral role. (kdr)
December 12, 2018 Filing 11 Case electronically transferred in from District of District of Columbia; Case Number 1:18-cv-00737. Electronic file copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
December 12, 2018 Case transferred to the U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas, pursuant to Court Order entered 11/15/2018. Sent to Court by extraction. (jf) [Transferred from dcd on 12/12/2018.]
November 15, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Transfer due by 12/10/2018. (zjd) [Transferred from dcd on 12/12/2018.]
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying #6 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and transferring this action to the U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas. Plaintiff is allowed leave to amend his Complaint within 21 days of the case being docketed in that court. See the attached Memorandum Opinion and Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 11/15/2018. (lcapm1) [Transferred from dcd on 12/12/2018.]
August 21, 2018 Filing 9 REPLY to opposition to motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by MARK T. ESPER. (Haugh, Jeremy) [Transferred from dcd on 12/12/2018.]
August 16, 2018 Filing 8 RESPONSE re #6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by CHARLES A. FOSTER. (jf) [Transferred from dcd on 12/12/2018.]
July 16, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Response due by 8/16/2018. (zjd) [Transferred from dcd on 12/12/2018.]
July 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER advising Plaintiff to respond by August 16, 2018, to Defendant's #6 Motion to Dismiss or risk dismissal of the case. Please see the attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 07/16/2018. (lcapm1) [Transferred from dcd on 12/12/2018.]
July 16, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss by MARK T. ESPER (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Haugh, Jeremy) [Transferred from dcd on 12/12/2018.]
June 19, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Response due by 7/16/2018. (zjd) [Transferred from dcd on 12/12/2018.]
June 19, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant's #5 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant shall respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before July 16, 2018. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 06/19/2018. (lcapm1) [Transferred from dcd on 12/12/2018.]
June 19, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by MARK T. ESPER (Haugh, Jeremy) [Transferred from dcd on 12/12/2018.]
May 15, 2018 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 04/30/2018., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/1/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/30/2018.) (jf) [Transferred from dcd on 12/12/2018.]
May 8, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy Allen Haugh on behalf of MARK T. ESPER (Haugh, Jeremy) [Transferred from dcd on 12/12/2018.]
April 4, 2018 SUMMONS (3) Issued as to MARK T. ESPER, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (zrdj) [Transferred from dcd on 12/12/2018.]
March 29, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against MARK T. ESPER (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 4616090314) with Jury Demand filed by CHARLES A. FOSTER. (zsth) Modified on 4/26/2018 (znmw). [Transferred from dcd on 12/12/2018.]
March 29, 2018 NOTICE OF CORRECTED COMPLAINT. Original complaint was entered in error and plaintiff was instructed to refile said pleading. (zsth) [Transferred from dcd on 12/12/2018.]
March 29, 2018 Filing 1 ENTERED IN ERROR.....COMPLAINT against MARK T. ESPER ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 4616090314) with Jury Demand filed by CHARLES A. FOSTER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(zrdj) Modified on 4/25/2018 (zsth). [Transferred from dcd on 12/12/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Foster v. Esper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of the Army
Represented By: Jeremy Allen Haugh
Represented By: Jamie Goss Dempsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles A Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?