Dotson v. Monroe et al

Plaintiff: Carl E Dotson
Defendant: C Monroe, Larry Jegley and Bill Simpson
Case Number: 4:2018cv00935
Filed: December 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: D P Marshall
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed. C Monroe served on 2/4/2019. (llg)
February 14, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Change of Address by Carl E Dotson. (ljb)
February 12, 2019 Filing 12 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Carl E Dotson re #10 Order. (fjg)
February 4, 2019 Filing 11 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Carl E. Dotson re #8 Motion to Dismiss Party filed by Carl E Dotson (jap)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying as moot #8 Motion to dismiss because Simpson has already been dismissed, No. #7 . Dotson is directed to update his address with the Clerk by 3/4/2019. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/1/2019. (jak)
January 29, 2019 Filing 9 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Carl E Dotson re #7 Order. (fjg)
January 25, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss Party by Carl E Dotson. (ljb)
January 23, 2019 Summons Issued as to C Monroe and forwarded to the U.S. Marshal for service. (cmn)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER lifting the stay and directs the Clerk to reopen this case. Dotson's claims against Jegley and Simpson are dismissed without prejudice. Dotson may proceed with his unlawful search and seizure claim against Little Rock Police Officer C. Monroe. The Court directs the Clerk to prepare a summons for Monroe. The United States Marshal shall serve the complaint, addendum, summons, and this Order on Monroe without prepayment of fees and costs or security. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/23/2019. (jak)
January 15, 2019 Filing 6 Letter to the Court from Plaintiff Carl E. Dotson. (kdr)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #1 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Dotson must pay the filing fee but over time. Dotson's custodian is directed to collect monthly payments from Dotson's prison trust account and forward them to the Clerk of the Court until the total $350 filing fee is paid in full. The Court directs the Clerk to send a copy of this Order to the Administrator of the Pulaski County Detention Center. This case is stayed. Any motion to reopen must be filed within 60 days of the final disposition of his state case. If Dotson doesn't file a timely motion to reopen or status report by 1/8/2020 then the Court will reopen the case and dismiss it without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/8/2019. (jak)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PLAINTIFFS. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/2/2019. (jak)
December 20, 2018 Filing 3 ADDENDUM to #2 Complaint filed by Carl E Dotson. (ljb)
December 19, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Carl E Dotson. (ljb)
December 19, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Carl E Dotson. (ljb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dotson v. Monroe et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C Monroe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Jegley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl E Dotson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?