Vient v. Wehco Media

Plaintiff: Benjamin Vient
Defendant: Wehco Media
Case Number: 4:2018cv00942
Filed: December 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Receive Court Documents via my email address by Benjamin Vient (jap)
February 19, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Submit Filings via filing attachment with email by Benjamin Vient (jap)
February 19, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Process of Service by Benjamin Vient (jap)
January 29, 2019 Summons Issued and returned to plaintiff Benjamin Vient for service as to Wehco Media. (jap)
December 27, 2018 Filing 2 REPORT on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Copyright forwarded to the Register of Copyrights, U.S. Copyright Office, by the Clerk of Court. (thd)
December 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Benjamin Vient against Wehco Media. Fee $400. Receipt Number LIT070147. No summons issued. (cmn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vient v. Wehco Media
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wehco Media
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Vient
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?