Easter v. Shree Laxmi Krupa Inc et al
Plaintiff: Kristy Easter
Defendant: Chandrika Patel, Shree Ganesh Krupa Inc and Shree Laxmi Krupa Inc
Case Number: 4:2019cv00021
Filed: January 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Billy Roy Wilson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #14 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christopher Wesley Burks terminated. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 5/21/19. (mmb)
May 21, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Chris Burks by All Plaintiffs (Burks, Christopher)
May 16, 2019 Filing 13 FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 2/18/2020 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # A401 before Judge Billy Roy Wilson. Discovery due by 11/20/2019. Daubert and Dispositive Motions due by 12/5/2019. Pretrial Disclosure Sheet due by 1/21/2020. Entered at the direction of the Court on 5/16/19. (mmb)
May 6, 2019 Filing 12 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Kristy Easter. (Sanford, Joshua)
April 17, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Chandrika Patel, Shree Ganesh Krupa Inc, Shree Laxmi Krupa Inc.(Edwards, John)
March 21, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re 10 Order. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the answer deadline as April 17, 2019 pursuant to instruction from Chambers.(jak)
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #9 the Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Accordingly, Defendants' answer or responsive pleading must be filed by 5 p.m., Wednesday, April 17, 2019. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 03/20/19. (dmm)(Docket text modified on 3/21/2019 to correct the answer deadline)(jak)
March 19, 2019 Filing 9 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by All Defendants (Edwards, John)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #7 the Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or File Responsive Pleading. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 03/05/19. (dmm)
March 4, 2019 Filing 7 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by All Defendants (Edwards, John)
February 13, 2019 Filing 6 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 4/22/2019. Rule 26(f) Report due by 5/6/2019. Bench Trial set for 2/18/2020 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # A401 before Judge Billy Roy Wilson.Entered at the direction of the Court on 2/13/19. (mmb)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #4 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Accordingly, Defendants' answer or responsive pleading must be filed by 5 p.m., Tuesday, March 5, 2019. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 02/12/19. (dmm)
February 12, 2019 Filing 4 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by All Defendants (Edwards, John)
February 12, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #3 Notice of Appearance. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to indicate the notice of appearance by attorney John Timothy Edwards is on behalf of All Defendants as marked on the document. (jak)
February 12, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by John Timothy Edwards on behalf of All Defendants (Edwards, John) (Docket text modified on 2/12/2019 to correct the party filers) (jak)
January 24, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kristy Easter. Chandrika Patel served on 1/22/2019; Shree Ganesh Krupa Inc served on 1/22/2019; Shree Laxmi Krupa Inc served on 1/22/2019. (Sanford, Joshua)
January 10, 2019 Filing 1 ORIGINAL COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Kristy Easter. Summons issued and returned to counsel. (Fee of $400 paid, Receipt #LIT070388.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ljb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Easter v. Shree Laxmi Krupa Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chandrika Patel
Represented By: John Timothy Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shree Ganesh Krupa Inc
Represented By: John Timothy Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shree Laxmi Krupa Inc
Represented By: John Timothy Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristy Easter
Represented By: Christopher Wesley Burks
Represented By: Joshua Sanford
Represented By: Daniel D. Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?