Littlefield v. USA
Plaintiff: Shelton Littlefield
Defendant: USA
Case Number: 4:2019cv00027
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shelton Littlefield. USA served on 1/23/2019. (Donovan, David)
January 17, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shelton Littlefield. USA served on 1/17/2019. (Donovan, David)
January 14, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #1 Complaint. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to remover the reference to a Jury Demand. (thd)
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Shelton Littlefield against USA. Fee $400. Receipt Number LIT070419. Summons issued and returned to counsel for service. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(cmn) (Docket text modified on 1/14/2019 to remove the reference to the Jury Demand.) (thd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Littlefield v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelton Littlefield
Represented By: David M. Donovan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?