King v. Bombgardener et al

Plaintiff: Brandon King
Defendant: Bombgardener, Pope County Detention Center and Rowdy Sweet
Case Number: 4:2019cv00029
Filed: January 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
0 Judge: Beth Deere
1 Judge: Billy Roy Wilson
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2019 Filing 8 APPELLATE FILING FEE NOTICE to Plaintiff. (ljb)
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 JUDGMENT: Based on #6 order entered today, this case is dismissed, without prejudice. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 1/31/2019. (ljb)
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER approving and adopting #4 Recommendation in all respects; and dismissing, without prejudice, Mr. King's claims based on his failure to state a constitutional claim. This dismissal constitutes a "strike" for purposes of 28 U.S.C. 1915(g) and an in forma pauperis appeal of this dismissal would be frivolous and not taken in good faith. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 1/31/2019. (ljb)
January 29, 2019 Filing 5 OBJECTION to #4 Report and Recommendations by Brandon King. (kdr)
January 16, 2019 Filing 4 RECOMMENDED DISPOSITION recommending that Mr. King's claims be dismissed, without prejudice, based on his failure to state a constitutional claim for relief; that this dismissal count as a "strike" for purposes of 28 U.S.C. 1915(g); and suggesting that an informa pauperis appeal of this dismissal would be frivolous and would not be taken in good faith. Objections due within 14 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 1/16/2019. (csf)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONER-PLAINTIFFS granting #1 IFP motion; directing monthly payments be collected from Plaintiff's prison trust account until the entire $350 filing fee has been paid; and directing the Clerk of Court to send a copy of this Order to the Warden of Pope County Detention and the appropriate ADC offices. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 1/15/2019. (kdr)
January 14, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Brandon King. (ljb)
January 14, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Brandon King. (ljb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: King v. Bombgardener et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bombgardener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pope County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rowdy Sweet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?