Burton v. United States Department of the Navy
Plaintiff: Stacey Burton
Defendant: United States Department of the Navy
Case Number: 4:2019cv00056
Filed: January 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stacey Burton. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified receipts)(Stanley, James)
February 1, 2019 Summons Issued as to United States Department of the Navy, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and forwarded to Plaintiff's counsel for service. (cmn)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #1 Plaintiff Stacey Burton's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 2/1/2019. (cmn)
January 25, 2019 Filing 3 Deficiency Letter from Clerk of Court notifying party that #2 Complaint lacks an original signature. (cmn)
January 25, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT filed by Stacey Burton against United States Department of the Navy. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(cmn) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/4/2019: #2 Main Document - Correct) (cmn).
January 25, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Stacey Burton. (cmn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burton v. United States Department of the Navy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacey Burton
Represented By: James W. Stanley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of the Navy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?