Abdul-Bey v. Parker
Appellant: Kwami Abdul-Bey
Appellee: Maytrine L Parker
Case Number: 4:2019cv00101
Filed: February 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Brian S Miller
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:1334
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 JUDGMENT: Consistent with #7 Order, this case is remanded. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 3/19/2019. (jbh)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER dismissing Appellant Kwami Abdul-Bey's appeal and remanding to the bankruptcy court. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 3/19/2019. (jbh)
March 18, 2019 Filing 6 Appellant's Opening BRIEF filed by Kwami Abdul-Bey. (fjg)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #3 Motion to Extend Time. Petitioner is granted extension to 3/18/19 to file brief. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 3/11/19. (lp)
March 6, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #3 MOTION to Extend Time. CORRECTION: The original document was attached in error due to a clerical mistake by the Clerk's office (wrong image format). The correct document was added to docket entry #3 and is attached hereto for review by the parties. (jak)
March 6, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Suspend to Extend Time by Kwami Abdul-Bey (jap) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/6/2019: #1 Main Document - Correct) (jak).
February 7, 2019 Filing 2 SCHEDULING NOTICE (Bankruptcy Appeals). Appellant's brief is due 3/9/2019. Appellee's brief is due 30 days after service of Appellant's brief. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 2/7/2019.(cmn)
February 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT filed by Kwami Abdul-Bey. Bankruptcy Court case number 4:18-ap-01101. (Attachments: #1 BK DE#1, Complaint, #2 BK DE#5, Motion for Default Judgment, #3 BK DE#8, Hearing Continued, #4 BK Docket Sheet, #5 Transmittal Letter)(cmn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abdul-Bey v. Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Kwami Abdul-Bey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Maytrine L Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?