McNeil v. University of Arkansas Foundation Inc et al

Plaintiff: Minor McNeil
Defendant: University of Arkansas Foundation Inc, Mary Prince, Sherri L Robinson, UAMS and Cam Patterson
Case Number: 4:2019cv00104
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Billy Roy Wilson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER of USCA as to #18 Notice of Appeal filed by Minor McNeil. The Clerk of the United States District Court is requested to forward to this Court forthwith any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format. (fcd)
March 21, 2019 Filing 21 USCA Docketing Letter as to #18 Notice of Appeal filed by Minor McNeil. USCA Case Number 19-1595. (fcd)
March 21, 2019 Filing 20 USCA Appeal Fees received $ 505, receipt number LIT071349 re #18 Notice of Appeal filed by Minor McNeil. (fcd)
March 21, 2019 Filing 19 NOTIFICATION OF APPEAL and NOA SUPPLEMENT as to Minor McNeil re #18 Notice of Appeal, #17 Order Dismissing Case. (fcd)
March 21, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE OF APPEAL and Appeal Brief as to #17 Order Dismissing Case by Minor McNeil. (fcd)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #8 and #13 Motions to Dismiss; and dismissing this case. I decline to retain jurisdiction over the state law claims, assuming there are any. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 3/5/2019. (ljb)
March 5, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE to #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Minor McNeil. (kdr)
February 26, 2019 Filing 15 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #13 Motion to Dismiss Renewed filed by Cam Patterson, Mary Prince, Sherri L Robinson, University of Arkansas Foundation Inc. (Curran, David)
February 26, 2019 Filing 14 Deficiency Letter from Clerk of Court notifying party that #13 Motion to Dismiss is not accompanied by a supporting brief (Local Rule 7.2(a)). (jak)
February 25, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss Renewed by Cam Patterson, Mary Prince, Sherri L Robinson, University of Arkansas Foundation Inc (Curran, David)
February 22, 2019 Filing 12 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT Pleading Special Matters Continued Congressional Intent with Jury Demand against Cam Patterson, Mary Prince, Sherri L Robinson, University of Arkansas Foundation Inc, filed by Minor McNeil (jap)
February 22, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE/Entry of Appearance by Minor McNeil (jap)
February 22, 2019 Filing 10 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 5/2/2019. Rule 26(f) Report due by 5/16/2019. Jury Trial set for 3/3/2020 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # A401 before Judge Billy Roy Wilson. Entered at the direction of the Court on 2/22/19. (mmb)
February 22, 2019 Filing 9 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #8 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, filed by Cam Patterson, Mary Prince, Sherri L Robinson, University of Arkansas Foundation Inc. (Curran, David)
February 22, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Cam Patterson, Mary Prince, Sherri L Robinson, University of Arkansas Foundation Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Pulaski County Complaint, #2 Exhibit Pulaski County Dismissal)(Curran, David)
February 22, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by David A. Curran on behalf of Cam Patterson, Mary Prince, Sherri L Robinson, University of Arkansas Foundation Inc (Curran, David)
February 14, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of filing Proof of Service by Minor McNeil (jap)
February 14, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Minor McNeil. Sherri L Robinson served on 2/8/2019. (jap)
February 14, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Minor McNeil. Mary Prince served on 2/11/2019. (jap)
February 14, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Minor McNeil. Cam Patterson served on 2/8/2019. (jap)
February 8, 2019 Filing 2 PRO SE ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Minor McNeil. (ljb)
February 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Minor McNeil. Summons issued and returned to Plaintiff. (Fee of $400 paid, Receipt #LIT070760.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ljb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McNeil v. University of Arkansas Foundation Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Arkansas Foundation Inc
Represented By: David A. Curran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Prince
Represented By: David A. Curran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherri L Robinson
Represented By: David A. Curran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UAMS
Represented By: David A. Curran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cam Patterson
Represented By: David A. Curran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Minor McNeil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?