Jones v. JHook Investments Inc et al

Plaintiff: Jonathan Jones
Defendant: Ivy Hall Inc, Jeff Hooker and JHook Investments Inc
Case Number: 4:2019cv00105
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Brian S Miller
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jonathan Jones. All Defendants. (Sanford, Joshua)
March 21, 2019 Filing 4 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER:Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 5/20/2019. Rule 26(f) Report due by 6/3/2019. Bench Trial set for 4/6/2020 09:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 2D before Chief Judge Brian S. Miller. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 3/21/19. (lp)
March 11, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Jeff Hooker, Ivy Hall Inc, JHook Investments Inc.(Vandiver, Brian)
March 4, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Anthony Vandiver on behalf of All Defendants (Vandiver, Brian)
February 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Jonathan Jones. Fee of $400 paid. Receipt Number LIT070783. Summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. JHook Investments Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ivy Hall Inc
Represented By: Brian Anthony Vandiver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Hooker
Represented By: Brian Anthony Vandiver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JHook Investments Inc
Represented By: Brian Anthony Vandiver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Jones
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Represented By: Joshua Sanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?