Stephens v. Sylvester et al
Plaintiff: Timothy Stephens
Defendant: Mike Sylvester, Janeka Watkins, Zachary Thompson, Jason Bangs, Charles Hendricks and Does Captain, Unknown, Pulaski County Detention Facility
Case Number: 4:2019cv00113
Filed: February 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: James M Moody
Referring Judge: J Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 4, 2019 Docket Note: Docket sheet mailed to Plaintiff (tjb)
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Status Update; the Clerk is directed to send him a copy of the docket sheet for this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 4/4/19. (tjb)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PARTIAL RECOMMENDED DISPOSITION recommending Stephens be allowed to proceed with his inhumane conditions of confinement claims against Sergeant Zachary Thompson, Sergeant Janeka Watkins, Lieutenant Jason Bangs, Jail Administrator Mike Sylvester, and Jail Administrator Charles Hendricks, in their individual and official capacity, and that service be ordered on them; Stephens's claims against the Doe Defendants be dismissed without prejudice; the Court certify that an in forma pauperis appeal from any Order adopting this Recommendation would not be taken in good faith #2 #7 ; Objections due within 14 days of the date of this Recommendation. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 4/3/19. (tjb)
March 29, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Status Update by Timothy Stephens. (llg)
March 4, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Timothy Stephens. (llg)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER striking #2 Complaint from the record; directing the Clerk to mail Stephens a 1983 complaint form that is labeled "Substituted Complaint;" and directing Stephens to file, within 30 days of the date of this Order, a Substituted Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 2/25/2019. (kdr)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONERS granting #1 IFP motion; directing monthly payments be collected from Plaintiff's institutional account, until a total of $350 has been paid; and directing the Clerk to send a copy of this Order to the Administrator of the Pulaski County Detention Facility. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 2/20/219. (kdr)
February 19, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE Of Filing Additional Information to Assist in Expediting Service by Timothy Stephens. (llg)
February 19, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by Timothy Stephens. (llg)
February 11, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Timothy Stephens. (llg)[STRICKEN from the record, pursuant to #6 Order] ( Modified on 2/25/2019 )(kdr).
February 11, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Timothy Stephens. (llg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stephens v. Sylvester et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Sylvester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janeka Watkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zachary Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Bangs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Hendricks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does Captain, Unknown, Pulaski County Detention Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?