Gumm v. Pennymac Loan Services LLC

Plaintiff: Bridget Gumm
Defendant: Pennymac Loan Services LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00127
Filed: February 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Brian S Miller
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 JUDGMENT: Pursuant to #20 Order entered on this day, this case is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 3/22/2019. (kdr)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: Plaintiff Bridget Gumm has moved to dismiss her case without prejudice #19 . Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a), this case is dismissed without prejudice with each party bearing its own fees and costs. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 3/22/2019. (kdr)
March 20, 2019 Filing 19 First MOTION to Dismiss Petition Without Prejudice by Bridget Gumm (Sanford, Jon)
March 18, 2019 Filing 18 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.)Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Brian S. Miller:Motion Hearing/Status Conference held on 3/18/2019. Discussion re: pending motions. Plaintiff is to file response to motion to dismiss by noon on 3/21/2019. Allison Koile present for the plaintiff. Johnathan Horton and Matthew Davis present for the defendant. (Court Reporter Judy Ammons.) (lp)
March 18, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Allison Elizabeth Ann Koile on behalf of Bridget Gumm (Koile, Allison)
March 15, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Hearing: Motion Hearing set for 3/18/2019 10:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 2D before Chief Judge Brian S. Miller. (lp)
March 13, 2019 Filing 15 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by All Plaintiffs (Sanford, Jon)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 2/27/19. (lp)
February 26, 2019 Filing 13 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #12 Motion to Dismiss filed by Pennymac Loan Services LLC. (Henry, Judy)
February 26, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss by Pennymac Loan Services LLC (Henry, Judy)
February 26, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Matthew Davis. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3411703. Filed by Pennymac Loan Services LLC (Henry, Judy)
February 26, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Nicola Shiels. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3411702. Filed by Pennymac Loan Services LLC (Henry, Judy)
February 26, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Thomas Yoxall. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3411691. Filed by Pennymac Loan Services LLC (Henry, Judy)
February 22, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Johnathan D. Horton on behalf of Pennymac Loan Services LLC (Horton, Johnathan)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER re #6 Notice of Hearing : the hearing scheduled for 2/21/19 is cancelled per agreement between parties. Hearing will be reset for a later date. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 2/20/19. (lp)
February 20, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Hearing: Motion Hearing re: Doc. No. 2 is set for 2/21/2019 10:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 2D before Chief Judge Brian S. Miller. (lp)
February 19, 2019 Filing 5 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Based on #4 Order, the Clerk's office has reassigned the case to Chief Judge Brian S. Miller. (jak)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER directing the Clerk to reassign the above styled case. Signed at the direction of the Court on 2/19/2019. (cmn)
February 19, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Pennymac Loan Services LLC identifying Corporate Parent Private National Mortgage Acceptance Company LLC for Pennymac Loan Services LLC. (cmn)
February 19, 2019 Filing 2 PETITION FOR TEMPORARY AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION filed by Bridget Gumm against Pennymac Loan Services LLC. (cmn)
February 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Pennymac Loan Services LLC from Pope County Circuit Court, case number 58CV-19-77. Fee $400 receipt number LIT070896. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(cmn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gumm v. Pennymac Loan Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pennymac Loan Services LLC
Represented By: Judy Simmons Henry
Represented By: Thomas G. Yoxall
Represented By: Matthew H. Davis
Represented By: Nicola M. Shiels
Represented By: Johnathan D. Horton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bridget Gumm
Represented By: Jon R. Sanford
Represented By: Allison Elizabeth Ann Koile
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?