Anderson v. Dolgencorp LLC et al
Plaintiff: Irish Denise Anderson
Defendant: Dollar General LLC and Dolgencorp LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00145
Filed: February 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Brian S Miller
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 JUDGMENT: Consistent with #13 order entered on this day, this case is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 4/25/2019. (kdr)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #9 Dolgencorp LLC's motion to dismiss or, alternatively, compel arbitration and stay proceedings; and dismissing this case, without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 4/25/2019. (kdr)
April 22, 2019 Filing 12 REQUESTING to Proceed in Court re #9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Irish Denise Anderson. (jap)
April 15, 2019 Filing 11 DECLARATION of Debbie Roach by Dolgencorp LLC. re #9 Motion to Dismiss filed by Dolgencorp LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - E-Signature agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Plaintiff's Arbitration Agreement)(Graham, Stanley)
April 15, 2019 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM re #9 MOTION to Dismiss Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings filed by Dolgencorp LLC. Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss or, Alternatively, Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings (Graham, Stanley)
April 15, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings by Dolgencorp LLC (Graham, Stanley)
March 29, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Dollar General LLC served on 3/25/2019. (llg)
March 29, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Dolgencorp LLC served on 3/27/2019. (llg)
March 29, 2019 Summons Reissued as to Dolgencorp LLC and forwarded to U.S. Marshal for service. (ljb)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #5 motion for order. The clerk is directed to prepare the summons, and the US Marshal is directed to serve the defendant at the updated address. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 03/28/2019. (sj)
March 27, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Order filed by Irish Denise Anderson. (fjg)
February 28, 2019 Summons Issued as to All Defendants and forwarded to USMS for service. (kdr)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting Plaintiff Irish Anderson's #1 motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis; and directing the Clerk to prepare the summons, and directing the USMS to serve a copy of #2 the complaint and summons on the defendants. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 2/28/2019. (kdr) (Docket text Modified on 3/1/2019 to correct a typographical error) (jak)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER provisionally granting #1 Application for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, pursuant to General Order No. 29. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 2/25/2019. (kdr)
February 25, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Irish Denise Anderson.(kdr)
February 25, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Irish Denise Anderson. (kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson v. Dolgencorp LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irish Denise Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dollar General LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dolgencorp LLC
Represented By: Stanley E. Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?