Lovelace v. Ameriprise Auto & Home Insurance Agency Inc et al
Plaintiff: Belincia Lovelace
Defendant: Ameriprise Auto & Home Insurance Agency Inc, IDS Property Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Direct Holdings Inc, Progressive Corporation, American Strategic Insurance Corp, Progressive Specialty Insurance Agency Inc and Ameriprise Financial Inc
Case Number: 4:2019cv00150
Filed: February 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: James M Moody
Referring Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2019 Filing 27 REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS filed by Progressive Corporation, Progressive Direct Holdings Inc, Progressive Specialty Insurance Agency Inc. (Baker, John)
April 26, 2019 Filing 26 REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS filed by American Strategic Insurance Corp. (Baker, John)
April 22, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #23 and #25 Brief in Support. CORRECTION: The docket text for docket entry #23 was modified to correct the linkage to #22 Response. The docket text for docket entry #25 was modified to correct the linkage to #24 Response. (jak)
April 19, 2019 Filing 25 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #24 Response filed by Belincia Lovelace. (Honaker, Michael)(Docket text modified on 4/22/2019 to correct the linkage)(jak)
April 19, 2019 Filing 24 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Response in Opposition to Progressive Defendants Motion to Dismiss filed by Belincia Lovelace. (Honaker, Michael)
April 19, 2019 Filing 23 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #22 Response filed by Belincia Lovelace. (Honaker, Michael) (Docket text modified on 4/22/2019 to correct the linkage) (jak)
April 19, 2019 Filing 22 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Belincia Lovelace. (Honaker, Michael)
April 15, 2019 Filing 21 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER:Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 5/22/2019; Rule 26(f) Report due by 6/5/2019. Proposed Jury Trial set sometime during the week of 4/20/2020 at 9:15 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 4A before Judge James M. Moody Jr. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 4/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Final Scheduling Order)(kog)
April 11, 2019 Filing 20 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Complaint and Summons , filed by Belincia Lovelace. Progressive Corporation served on 4/2/2019. (Hodges, David)
April 2, 2019 Summons Issued as to Progressive Corporation. Summons returned to plaintiff's attorney for service upon defendant. (jap)
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . Plaintiff's responses are due 4/19/19. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 3/15/19. (amr)
March 15, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Belincia Lovelace (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hodges, David)
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 motion to admit counsel pro hac vice. Thomas J. Butler is hereby admitted to appear before this Court as co-counsel of record in this action. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 3/15/2019. (ljb)
March 13, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Thomas J. Butler. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3421893. Filed by Ameriprise Auto & Home Insurance Agency Inc, Ameriprise Financial Inc, IDS Property Casualty Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Thomas J. Butler)(Smyth, John)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 motion to admit counsel pro hac vice of separate Defendants. John A. Little, Jr. is hereby admitted to appear before this Court as co-counsel of record in this action. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 3/12/2019. (ljb)
March 11, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by John A. Little, Jr.. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3420238. Filed by Ameriprise Auto & Home Insurance Agency Inc, Ameriprise Financial Inc, IDS Property Casualty Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of John A. Little)(Smyth, John)
March 6, 2019 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Progressive Corporation, Progressive Direct Holdings Inc, Progressive Specialty Insurance Agency Inc (Baker, John)
March 6, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by American Strategic Insurance Corp (Baker, John)
March 6, 2019 Filing 11 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #10 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Progressive Corporation, Progressive Direct Holdings Inc, Progressive Specialty Insurance Agency Inc. (Baker, John)
March 6, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Progressive Corporation, Progressive Direct Holdings Inc, Progressive Specialty Insurance Agency Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Baker, John)
March 6, 2019 Filing 9 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #8 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by American Strategic Insurance Corp. (Baker, John)
March 6, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by American Strategic Insurance Corp (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Baker, John)
March 6, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by John Keeling Baker on behalf of American Strategic Insurance Corp, Progressive Corporation, Progressive Direct Holdings Inc, Progressive Specialty Insurance Agency Inc (Baker, John)
March 6, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Ameriprise Auto & Home Insurance Agency Inc, Ameriprise Financial Inc, IDS Property Casualty Insurance Company.(Smyth, John)
February 28, 2019 Filing 5 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Based on #4 Order, the Clerk's office has reassigned the case to Judge James M. Moody Jr. (jak)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER directing the Clerk to reassign the above styled case. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 2/28/2019. (cmn)
February 27, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Ameriprise Auto & Home Insurance Agency Inc, Ameriprise Financial Inc, IDS Property Casualty Insurance Company. (cmn)
February 27, 2019 Filing 2 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Belincia Lovelace against All Defendants. (cmn)
February 27, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Ameriprise Auto & Home Insurance Agency Inc, Ameriprise Financial Inc, IDS Property Casualty Insurance Company from Pulaski County Circuit Court, case number 60CV-19-154. Fee $400 receipt number LIT070999. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(cmn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lovelace v. Ameriprise Auto & Home Insurance Agency Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ameriprise Auto & Home Insurance Agency Inc
Represented By: John A. Little, Jr.
Represented By: John A. Smyth, III
Represented By: Thomas J. Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IDS Property Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: John A. Little, Jr.
Represented By: John A. Smyth, III
Represented By: Thomas J. Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Direct Holdings Inc
Represented By: John Keeling Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Corporation
Represented By: John Keeling Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Strategic Insurance Corp
Represented By: John Keeling Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Specialty Insurance Agency Inc
Represented By: John Keeling Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ameriprise Financial Inc
Represented By: John A. Little, Jr.
Represented By: John A. Smyth, III
Represented By: Thomas J. Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Belincia Lovelace
Represented By: David A. Hodges
Represented By: Michael Benjamin Honaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?