Nooner v. Miller et al
Plaintiff: Terrick Nooner
Defendant: J Leon Holmes, J Thomas Ray, Kristine G Baker, Brian S Miller, D Price Marshall, Beth Deer, Jerry W Cavaneau, Susan Webber Wright, Billy R Wilson and James M Moody
Case Number: 4:2019cv00194
Filed: March 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying as moot #9 Plaintiff's Motion for Recusal. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 4/12/2019. (ljb)
April 1, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Recusal Against All Judges of the Eastern District of Arkansas by Terrick Nooner. (llg)
March 29, 2019 Filing 8 APPELLATE FILING FEE NOTICE to Plaintiff. (cmn)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 JUDGMENT: Consistent with #6 Order, this case is dismissed, without prejudice. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 3/29/2019. (cmn)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER denying #2 Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis; dismissing without prejudice #1 Plaintiff's Complaint pursuant to the three-strikes rule; and certifying that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order of Dismissal and the accompanying Judgment would not be taken in good faith. If Plaintiff wishes to continue this case, he must submit within 30 days of the entry of this Order: (a) the statutory filing fee of $400 and (b) file a motion to reopen the case. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 3/29/2019. (cmn)
March 20, 2019 Filing 5 Case electronically transferred in from District of District of Columbia; Case Number 1:19-cv-00338. Electronic file copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TRANSFERRING PRO SE CASE to the USDC for the Eastern District of Arkansas. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Transfer due by 3/20/2019. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 02/27/2018. (zsb) [Transferred from dcd on 3/20/2019.]
February 4, 2019 Filing 3 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT for period of six months by TERRICK NOONER (zsb) [Transferred from dcd on 3/20/2019.]
February 4, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by TERRICK NOONER (zsb) [Transferred from dcd on 3/20/2019.]
February 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by TERRICK NOONER.(zsb) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/7/2019: #1 Additional Documents to the Complaint) (zmd). [Transferred from dcd on 3/20/2019.]
February 4, 2019 Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 02/04/2019. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zsb) [Transferred from dcd on 3/20/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nooner v. Miller et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrick Nooner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Leon Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Thomas Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristine G Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian S Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D Price Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beth Deer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry W Cavaneau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Webber Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Billy R Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James M Moody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?