Elizondo v. Pafford EMS LLC

Plaintiff: Jessie Elizondo
Defendant: Pafford EMS LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00250
Filed: April 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Referring Judge: Brian S Miller
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #8 MOTION to Certify Class. Replies due by 7/12/2019. The statute of limitations for all punitive future opt-ins is tolled for 30 days. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 6/11/19. (lp)
June 10, 2019 Filing 10 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #8 MOTION to Certify Class Motion for Conditional Certification, for Disclosure of Contact Information, and to send Notices by Jessie Elizondo (Burks, Christopher)
May 28, 2019 Filing 9 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #8 Motion to Certify Class,, filed by Jessie Elizondo. (Burks, Christopher)
May 28, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Certify Class Motion for Conditional Certification, for Disclosure of Contact Information, and to send Notices by Jessie Elizondo (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Notice of Right to Join Lawsuit, #2 Exhibit 2 - Proposed Consent to Join Collective Action, #3 Exhibit 3 - Proposed Texts of Electronic Transmission, #4 Exhibit 4 - Proposed Electronic Consent to Join, #5 Exhibit 5 - Proposed Reminder Postcar, #6 Exhibit 6 - Declaration of Attorney Chris Burks, #7 Exhibit 7 - Declaration of Jessie Elizondo, #8 Exhibit 8 - Declaration of Arron Paduaevans)(Burks, Christopher)
May 22, 2019 Filing 7 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER:Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 7/11/2019. Rule 26(f) Report due by 7/25/2019. Bench Trial set for 6/8/2020 at 09:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 2D before Chief Judge Brian S. Miller. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 5/22/19. (lp)
May 6, 2019 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Based on #6 Order, the Clerk's office has reassigned the case to Chief Judge Brian S. Miller. (jak)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT directing the Clerk's Office to issue a Notice of Reassignment. Signed at the direction of the Court on 5/6/2019. (cmn)
May 3, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Guy W. Murphy, Jr on behalf of All Defendants (Murphy, Guy)
May 3, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Pafford EMS LLC (Phillips, James)
May 3, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Pafford EMS LLC.(Phillips, James)
May 3, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by James Lloyd Phillips, III on behalf of Pafford EMS LLC (Phillips, James)
April 12, 2019 Filing 1 CLASS AND COLLECTIVE ACTION COMPLAINT against Pafford EMS LLC filed by Jessie Elizondo. Summons issued and returned to counsel. (Fee of $400 paid. Receipt Number LIT071696.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jbh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Elizondo v. Pafford EMS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pafford EMS LLC
Represented By: James Lloyd Phillips, III
Represented By: Guy W. Murphy, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessie Elizondo
Represented By: Christopher Wesley Burks
Represented By: Brandon M. Haubert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?