Kanamwangi v. Melvgin et al

Plaintiff: Isaac Kanamwangi
Defendant: DeAngelo Earl and Winburn E Melvgin, Jr
Case Number: 4:2019cv00251
Filed: April 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Joe J Volpe
Referring Judge: Billy Roy Wilson
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #11 Motion for Summary Judgment. CORRECTION: The docket entry was modified to correct the filing event as "MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment" as marked on the document. (jak)
July 8, 2019 Filing 13 STATEMENT OF FACTS (Local Rule 56.1) re #11 Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by DeAngelo Earl, Winburn E Melvgin, Jr. (Edwards, Brittany)
July 8, 2019 Filing 12 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #11 Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by DeAngelo Earl, Winburn E Melvgin, Jr. (Edwards, Brittany)
July 8, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Exhaustion by DeAngelo Earl, Winburn E Melvgin, Jr (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Administrative Directive 14-16, ADC Inmate Grievance Procedure, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Terri Grigsby, #3 Exhibit Inmate Grievance OR-19-188, #4 Exhibit Inmate Grievance OR-19-237)(Edwards, Brittany) (Docket entry modified on 7/8/2019 to correct the filing event) (jak)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 11/7/2019. Dispositive motions due by 12/9/2019. Dispositive motions on the issue of exhaustion due by 7/8/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 5/7/2019. (lej)
May 7, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by DeAngelo Earl, Winburn E Melvgin, Jr.(Edwards, Brittany)
May 3, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed. DeAngelo Earl served on 4/26/2019. (fjg)
May 3, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Winburn E Melvgin, Jr served on 4/26/2019. (fjg)
April 30, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE, CONSENT AND REFERENCE to a Magistrate Judge forwarded by the Clerk of Court. (lej)
April 30, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Brittany Nicole Edwards on behalf of DeAngelo Earl, Winburn E Melvgin, Jr (Edwards, Brittany)
April 17, 2019 Summons Issued as to DeAngelo Earl, Winburn E Melvgin, Jr. and forwarded to the U.S. Marshal for service. (ljb)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER directing the Clerk to prepare summons and the USM to serve Defendants without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefore. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 4/17/2019. (lej)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting Plaintiff's Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit #1 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 4/17/2019. (lej)
April 12, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Isaac Kanamwangi. (ljb)
April 12, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Isaac Kanamwangi. (ljb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kanamwangi v. Melvgin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DeAngelo Earl
Represented By: Brittany Nicole Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Winburn E Melvgin, Jr
Represented By: Brittany Nicole Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isaac Kanamwangi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?