France v. TD Auto Finance
Plaintiff: Leroy France
Defendant: TD Auto Finance
Case Number: 4:2019cv00285
Filed: April 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Brian S Miller
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 47:521
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER approving #3 the parties' stipulated protective order and hereby entering it. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 6/27/2019. (kdr)
June 26, 2019 Filing 5 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #4 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by TD Auto Finance. (Croft, Blaec)
June 26, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by TD Auto Finance (Croft, Blaec)
June 12, 2019 Filing 3 STIPULATION for Protective Order by All Parties by TD Auto Finance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Protective Order)(Croft, Blaec)
June 12, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Blaec C. Croft on behalf of TD Auto Finance (Croft, Blaec)
April 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against TD Auto Finance, filed by Leroy France. Fee of $400 paid. Receipt Number LIT071827. Summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: France v. TD Auto Finance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leroy France
Represented By: Daniel Zemel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TD Auto Finance
Represented By: Blaec C. Croft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?