Pierce v. Ideal Image et al
Plaintiff: Sarah Pierce
Defendant: Ideal Image and Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00306
Filed: April 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Referring Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Jin Seock Shin on behalf of Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC (Shin, Jin)
June 20, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Eugene X. Martin on behalf of Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC (Martin, Eugene)
June 18, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC (Malone, Robbie)
June 17, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Robbie L. Malone on behalf of Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC (Malone, Robbie)
June 17, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC.(Malone, Robbie)
June 3, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sarah Pierce. Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC served on 5/6/2019. (Leigh, Victoria)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 PRA's unopposed motion for extension of time to plead up to and including 6/18/2019. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 5/30/2019. (cmn) (Docket text modified on 5/31/2019 to correct typographical error.)(cmn)
May 30, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sarah Pierce. Ideal Image served on 5/13/2019. (Leigh, Victoria)
May 24, 2019 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Response by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC (Tucker, Everett)
May 24, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Everett Clarke Tucker, IV on behalf of Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC (Tucker, Everett)
May 14, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sarah Pierce. Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC served on 5/3/2019. (Leigh, Victoria)
May 1, 2019 Filing 3 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Based on #2 Order, the Clerk's office has reassigned the case to Judge Kristine G. Baker. (jak)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER directing the Clerk to reassign the above styled case. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 5/1/2019. (jbh)
April 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Sarah Pierce against All Defendants. Fee $400. Receipt Number LIT071907. Summons issued and returned to counsel for service. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(cmn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pierce v. Ideal Image et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Pierce
Represented By: Victoria Leigh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ideal Image
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC
Represented By: Jin Seock Shin
Represented By: Eugene X. Martin
Represented By: Everett Clarke Tucker, IV
Represented By: Robbie L. Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?