Strohmeyer v. GEICO Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Ashley Strohmeyer
Defendant: GEICO Insurance Company, GEICO County Mutual Insurance Company and GEICO Corporation
Case Number: 4:2019cv00314
Filed: May 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2019 Summons Issued and returned to counsel for plaintiff for service as to GEICO Corporation, GEICO County Mutual Insurance Company. (jap)
June 4, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Connie L. Grace on behalf of Ashley Strohmeyer (Grace, Connie)
May 24, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #8 Answer. CORRECTION: The original document was submitted in error (wrong image file). The correct document was added to docket entry #8 based on the attached correspondence. (cmn)
May 24, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by GEICO Corporation, GEICO County Mutual Insurance Company.(Drennon, Baxter) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/24/2019: #1 Main Document - Correct) (cmn).
May 20, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Complaint with Jury Demand against GEICO Insurance Company, filed by Ashley Strohmeyer (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Grace, Connie)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #5 Motion to Amend/Correct. Plaintiff is directed to file the amended complaint. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 05/20/2019. (jjb)
May 17, 2019 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint in Order to Substitute Party Defendants by Ashley Strohmeyer (Grace, Connie)
May 6, 2019 Filing 4 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 7/15/2019; Rule 26(f) Report due by 7/29/2019; and Jury Trial set for 5/11/2020 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock, Arkansas Courtroom # A530 before Judge Susan Webber Wright. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 5/6/2019. (hml)
May 2, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by GEICO Insurance Company.(Drennon, Baxter)
May 1, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against GEICO Insurance Company, filed by Ashley Strohmeyer. (jbh)
May 1, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by GEICO Insurance Company from Pulaski County Circuit Court, Case Number 60CV-19-2645. Fee of $400 paid, receipt #LIT071960. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jbh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strohmeyer v. GEICO Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Strohmeyer
Represented By: M. Justin Minton
Represented By: Connie L. Grace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEICO Insurance Company
Represented By: Nicholas Daniel Hornung
Represented By: Baxter D. Drennon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEICO County Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Nicholas Daniel Hornung
Represented By: Baxter D. Drennon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEICO Corporation
Represented By: Nicholas Daniel Hornung
Represented By: Baxter D. Drennon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?