Lawson v. Stonebrook Consulting Group LLC
Plaintiff: Dawn Lawson
Defendant: Stonebrook Consulting Group LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00321
Filed: May 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: James M Moody
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2019 Filing 4 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Stonebrook Consulting Group LLC. (ljb)
June 3, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by Dawn Lawson of Plaintiff's Request for Clerk's Entry of Default (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Document)(Agruss, Michael)
May 13, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dawn Lawson. Stonebrook Consulting Group LLC served on 5/10/2019. (Agruss, Michael)
May 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Stonebrook Consulting Group LLC, filed by Dawn Lawson. Fee of $400 paid. Receipt Number LIT071986. Summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lawson v. Stonebrook Consulting Group LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stonebrook Consulting Group LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawn Lawson
Represented By: Michael S. Agruss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?