Henson v. Montgomery
Plaintiff: Douglas D Henson, Jr
Defendant: Montgomery
Case Number: 4:2019cv00338
Filed: May 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Referring Judge: J Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RECOMMENDED DISPOSITION recommending this case be dismissed without prejudice due to a lack of prosecution; the Court certify that an in forma pauperis appeal from any Order adopting this Recommendation would not be taken in good faith #1 ; Objections due within 14 days of the date of this Recommendation. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 7/1/19. (tjb)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONERS directing the Clerk to send the Plaintiff an IFP application, along with an institutional trust fund account statement; and directing the Plaintiff to either pay the $400 filing fee or file an IFP motion on or before 6/10/2019, or the case will be dismissed without prejudice. Service is not appropriate at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 5/10/2019. (jbh)
May 9, 2019 Filing 3 Case electronically transferred in from District of Arkansas Western; Case Number 6:19-cv-06054. Electronic file copy of transfer order, case file, and docket sheet received.
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to District of Eastern District of Arkansas. Docket Sheet and case documents sent to receiving court. Original Order filed in 6:19cv6027, severing the Defendant and directing the Clerk to open this case. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on May 9, 2019. (hnc) [Transferred from arwd on 5/9/2019.]
May 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT REFERRED (42:1983) against Montgomery, filed by Douglas D Henson, Jr.(hnc) [Transferred from arwd on 5/9/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Henson v. Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas D Henson, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?