Campbell v. McAdoo et al
Plaintiff: Tywas Campbell
Defendant: Little Rock School District and Leron McAdoo
Case Number: 4:2019cv00340
Filed: May 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: James M Moody
Referring Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 16, 2019 Filing 6 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Based on #5 Order, the Clerk's office has reassigned the case to Judge James M. Moody Jr. (jak)
May 16, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #5 Order. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the signature as "Signed at the direction of the Court" as marked on the document. (cmn)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER directing the Clerk to reassign the above styled case. An Initial Scheduling Order has been entered with a proposed trial date of 5/18/2020. Signed at the direction of the Court on 5/16/2019. (cmn) (Docket text modified on 5/16/2019 to correct the signature.)(cmn)
May 13, 2019 Filing 4 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 7/22/2019; Rule 26(f) Report due by 8/5/2019; and Jury Trial set for 5/18/2020 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock, Arkansas Courtroom #A530 before Judge Susan Webber Wright. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 5/13/2019. (hml)
May 10, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Little Rock School District, Leron McAdoo.(Heller, Christopher)
May 10, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Tywas Campbell against All Defendants.(cmn)
May 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Pulaski County Circuit Court, case number 60CV-18-7131. Fee $400 receipt number LIT072143. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(cmn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Campbell v. McAdoo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Little Rock School District
Represented By: Christopher J. Heller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leron McAdoo
Represented By: Christopher J. Heller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tywas Campbell
Represented By: Willard Proctor, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?