Banks v. Turn Key Medical
Plaintiff: Dadrain Banks
Defendant: Turn Key Medical
Case Number: 4:2019cv00352
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: James M Moody
Referring Judge: Joe J Volpe
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #12 Motion for Copies. The Clerk is directed to copy Docket Entries 1-11 and mail them to Plaintiff. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 7/11/19. (dpb)
July 10, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Copies by Dadrain Banks. (ljb)
July 9, 2019 Filing 11 APPELLATE FILING FEE NOTICE to Plaintiff. (ljb)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 JUDGMENT: Pursuant to #9 order filed this date, judgment is entered dismissing this case without prejudice; the relief sought is denied. This dismissal counts as a "strike" and the Court certifies that an in forma pauperis appeal is considered frivolous and not in good faith. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 7/9/2019. (ljb)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER approving and adopting in its entirety #5 Proposed Findings and Recommended Disposition as this Court's findings in all respects; dismissing without prejudice #1 Plaintiff's Complaint for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted; counting dismissal of this action as a "strike" for purposes of 28 U.S.C. 1915(g); denying as moot #8 Plaintiff's motion for copies; and certifying that an in forma pauperis appeal from any Order adopting these recommendations and the accompanying Judgment would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 7/9/2019. (ljb)
July 3, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Copies by Dadrain Banks. (llg)
July 3, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing Calculation Sheet and Certificate of Prisoner Account by Dadrain Banks. (llg)
July 3, 2019 Filing 6 EXHIBIT by Dadrain Banks. (llg)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS that Plaintiff's complaint be dismissed without prejudice for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted #1 . Dismissal of this action count as a "strike" for purposes of 28 U.S.C. 1915(g). The Court certify, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that an in forma pauperis appeal from any order adopting these recommendations and the accompanying judgment would not be taken in good faith. Objections due no later than 14 days from the date of the findings and recommendations. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 6/21/2019. (lej)
June 11, 2019 Filing 4 EVIDENCE by Dadrain Banks. (llg)
June 4, 2019 Filing 3 EXHIBITS to #1 Complaint by Dadrain Banks. (ljb)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER that Plaintiff must submit either the $400 filing fee or a complete Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit within 30 days of the date of this order. His failure to do one or the other will result in the dismissal of this case without prejudice. If he so wishes, Plaintiff may complete a new complaint form in its entirety in accordance with this order, mark it as an "Amended Complaint," and file it within 30 days of the date of this order. Plaintiff's failure to timely file an amended complaint may result in the dismissal of his claims pursuant to LR 5.5(c)(2). Service is not appropriate at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 5/17/2019. (lej)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Turn Key Medical filed by Dadrain Banks. (llg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Banks v. Turn Key Medical
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dadrain Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Turn Key Medical
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?