Torrence v. Automobile Club Inter-Insurance Exchange
Plaintiff: Kathleen Torrence
Defendant: Automobile Club Inter-Insurance Exchange
Case Number: 4:2019cv00354
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: D P Marshall
Referring Judge: James M Moody
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 Filing 16 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Pursuant to #15 Order, the Clerk's office has reassigned the case to Judge James M. Moody Jr. (jak)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER transferring this case to the Honorable James M. Moody Jr. Any objection to transfer should be made by 7/19/2019, and Judge Moody will address it. The Court directs the Clerk to make the transfer by chip exchange. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/11/2019. (jak)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: Motion, No. #13 , granted. Reply, No. [13-1], deemed filed. In the future, any moving party may reply within seven calendar days of a response. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/10/2019. (slb)
July 5, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to File Reply to #8 Motion to Remand by Kathleen Torrence. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Reply)(Steadman, Timothy)(Docket text modified on 7/8/2019 to establish linkage) (jak)
June 28, 2019 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT re #10 Response in Opposition to Motion,, of Gail C. Louis by Automobile Club Inter-Insurance Exchange. (Crass, Kevin)
June 28, 2019 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT re #10 Response in Opposition to Motion,, of Wendy Kight by Automobile Club Inter-Insurance Exchange. (Crass, Kevin)
June 28, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Automobile Club Inter-Insurance Exchange. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Auto Policy, #2 Exhibit Letter, #3 Exhibit Letter from Hendricks, #4 Exhibit Letter from Kight, #5 Exhibit Fax, #6 Exhibit Summons Complaint, #7 Exhibit Proof of Service, #8 Exhibit Email, #9 Exhibit Motion to Dismiss, #10 Exhibit Motion and Brief, #11 Exhibit Summons Amended Complaint, #12 Exhibit Proof of Service, #13 Exhibit Corporation Information)(Crass, Kevin)
June 14, 2019 Filing 9 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #8 Remand to State Court filed by Kathleen Torrence. (Steadman, Timothy)
June 14, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Kathleen Torrence (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Steadman, Timothy)
May 23, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #5 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Automobile Club Inter-Insurance Exchange.(Crass, Kevin)
May 16, 2019 Filing 6 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION and Memorandum Brief in Support of her Motion for Voluntary Non-Suit of her Claims against Defendant AAA Arkansas Insurance Agency, Inc. by Kathleen Torrence. (kdr)
May 16, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Automobile Club Inter-Insurance Exchange, filed by Kathleen Torrence.(kdr)
May 16, 2019 Filing 4 BRIEF IN SUPPORT of #3 Motion to Dismiss by AAA Arkansas Arkansas Insurance Agency, Inc. (kdr)
May 16, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss by AAA Arkansas Insurance Agency Inc. (kdr)
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against AAA Arkansas Insurance Agency Inc, filed by Kathleen Torrence.(kdr)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL - CAFA Diversity Jurisdiction by Automobile Club Inter-Insurance Exchange from Pulaski County Circuit Court, Case Number 60CV-19-1251. Fee of $400 paid. Receipt Number LIT072199. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Torrence v. Automobile Club Inter-Insurance Exchange
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Torrence
Represented By: Jerry D. Garner
Represented By: Lloyd W. Kitchens, III
Represented By: John Holleman
Represented By: Timothy A. Steadman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Automobile Club Inter-Insurance Exchange
Represented By: Kevin A. Crass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?