Gilliam v. Staley et al
Plaintiff: Richard Gilliam
Defendant: Dean White, John Staley, Kevin McCoy and Matthew Hodge
Case Number: 4:2019cv00356
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: James M Moody
Referring Judge: J Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Filing 12 DECLARATIONS by Richard Gilliam. (ljb)
July 10, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Richard Gilliam. (ljb)
July 5, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Richard Gilliam. (llg)
May 30, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Richard Gilliam(kdr)
May 30, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Richard Gilliam. (kdr)
May 30, 2019 Filing 7 ADDENDUM to #2 Complaint filed by Richard Gilliam. (llg)
May 24, 2019 Filing 6 ADDENDUM to #2 Complaint filed by Richard Gilliam. (llg)
May 24, 2019 Filing 5 ADDENDUM to #2 Complaint, filed by Richard Gilliam.(kdr)
May 24, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Richard Gilliam. (ljb)
May 17, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #3 Order. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the description of the document filed as "INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONERS" and to indicate the motion was denied without prejudice as marked on the document. (jak)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONERS denying without prejudice #1 Plaintiff's IFP Motion; directing the Clerk to send another IFP application, along with a copy of this Order to the Plaintiff; directing the Plaintiff to: 1) complete and sign the IFP application; and 2) have an authorized jail official complete and sign the trust fund account statement and certificate; and return all forms to the Clerk on or before 6/17/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 5/17/2019. (kdr) (Docket text modified on 5/17/2019 to correct the description of the document filed) (jak)
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Richard Gilliam.(kdr)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Richard Gilliam. (kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gilliam v. Staley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dean White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Staley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Hodge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Gilliam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?