Odom v. Suero et al
Plaintiff: Rebecca Lynne Odom and Rebecca Lynne Holman
Defendant: Enoc Suero, John Does, American Van Lines Inc, Brandon Flynn, Robilyn Gordon and Amanda Payne
Case Number: 4:2019cv00364
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #11 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by American Van Lines Inc, Enoc Suero.(Breeding, Mark)
July 10, 2019 Filing 11 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Rebecca Lynne Odom. Summons issued as to Robilyn Gordon, Brandon Flynn, Amanda Payne and returned to counsel for service. (fjg)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #6 motion to withdraw counsel; directing the Clerk to terminate Mr. Hobbs as counsel of record for Ms. Odom; granting #9 Ms. Odom's amended motion for leave to file amended complaint; directing Ms. Odom to file her amended complaint within 10 days from the entry of this Order; and denying as moot #8 Ms. Odom's motion for leave to file amended complaint. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 7/9/2019. (ljb)
July 8, 2019 Filing 9 Amended MOTION to Amend/Correct #8 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Rebecca Lynne Odom (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Brewer, Anthony)
July 8, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Rebecca Lynne Odom (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Brewer, Anthony)
July 8, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony Bryce Brewer on behalf of Rebecca Lynne Odom (Brewer, Anthony)
July 5, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Rebecca Lynne Odom (Hobbs, Randal)
June 3, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons & Complaint , filed by Rebecca Lynne Odom. Enoc Suero served on 5/11/2019. (Hobbs, Randal)
May 20, 2019 Filing 4 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by American Van Lines Inc, Enoc Suero. (cmn)
May 20, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by American Van Lines Inc, Enoc Suero.(cmn)
May 20, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT filed by Rebecca Lynne Odom with Jury Demand against All Defendants.(cmn)
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by American Van Lines Inc, Enoc Suero from Pulaski County Circuit Court, case number 60CV-19-2956. Fee $400 receipt number LIT072239. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(cmn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Odom v. Suero et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Lynne Odom
Represented By: Randal Hastings Hobbs
Represented By: Anthony Bryce Brewer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Lynne Holman
Represented By: Randal Hastings Hobbs
Represented By: Anthony Bryce Brewer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enoc Suero
Represented By: Mark Steven Breeding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Van Lines Inc
Represented By: Mark Steven Breeding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robilyn Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amanda Payne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?