First International Bank & Trust v. First Arkansas Bank & Trust

Plaintiff: First International Bank & Trust
Defendant: First Arkansas Bank & Trust
Case Number: 4:2019cv00365
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Billy Roy Wilson
Referring Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2019 Filing 16 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #15 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by First International Bank & Trust. (Filed as a separate document pursuant to request from the filing attorney) (jak)
July 16, 2019 Filing 15 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) by First International Bank & Trust (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss)(Ziegler, Chad)
June 25, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against First International Bank & Trust by First Arkansas Bank & Trust.(Wilson, Patrick)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #10 Defendant's unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Accordingly, Defendant's answer or responsive pleading must be filed by 5 p.m., Tuesday, June 25, 2019. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 06/03/19. (dmm)
June 3, 2019 Filing 12 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 8/12/2019. Rule 26(f) Report due by 8/26/2019. Jury Trial set for 5/26/2020 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # A401 before Judge Billy Roy Wilson. Entered at the direction of the Court on 6/3/19. (mmb)
May 31, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Jon Charles Dougherty on behalf of First Arkansas Bank & Trust (Dougherty, Jon)
May 31, 2019 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint / Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading by First Arkansas Bank & Trust (Wilson, Patrick)
May 31, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick Darrow Wilson on behalf of First Arkansas Bank & Trust (Wilson, Patrick)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Accordingly, Chad E. Ziegler is admitted Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 5/23/19. (mmb)
May 22, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint , filed by First International Bank & Trust. First Arkansas Bank & Trust served on 5/21/2019. (Kolb, Cynthia)
May 22, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Chad E. Ziegler. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3465655. Filed by First International Bank & Trust (Kolb, Cynthia)
May 22, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by First International Bank & Trust (Kolb, Cynthia)
May 21, 2019 Filing 4 REPORT on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Trademark forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office by the Clerk of Court. (thd)
May 21, 2019 Filing 3 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Based on #2 Order, the Clerk's office has reassigned the case to Judge Billy Roy Wilson. (jak)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER directing the Clerk to reassign the above styled case. Signed at the direction of the Court on 5/21/2019. (cmn)
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by First International Bank & Trust against First Arkansas Bank & Trust. Fee $400. Receipt Number LIT072241. Summons issued and returned to counsel for service. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(cmn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: First International Bank & Trust v. First Arkansas Bank & Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Arkansas Bank & Trust
Represented By: Jon Charles Dougherty
Represented By: Patrick Darrow Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: First International Bank & Trust
Represented By: Chad E. Ziegler
Represented By: Cynthia W. Kolb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?