Home to Community Living Inc v. Arkansas Department of Human Services et al
Plaintiff: Home to Community Living Inc
Defendant: Empower Healthcare Solutions LLC, Arkansas Department of Human Services, Paula Stone, Arkansas Total Care Inc, APC Passe LLC, Cindy Gillespie, Optum Services Inc and Centene Corporation
Case Number: 4:2019cv00368
Filed: May 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Brian S Miller
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Filing 41 MOTION to Dismiss Motion to Non-suit by Home to Community Living Inc (Sutter, Luther)
June 27, 2019 Filing 40 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by APC Passe LLC (Marts, Gary)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) Order granting #37 motion for extension of time to file response/reply re #29 motion to compel motion to compel arbitration, #16 motion to sever and compel arbitration or dismiss, #19 motion to dismiss , #7 motion to compel arbitration, #12 motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 6/27/19. (zwt)
June 26, 2019 Filing 38 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Optum Services Inc (Grinder, Lauren)
June 25, 2019 Filing 37 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Various Motions by Home to Community Living Inc (Gillham, Lucien)
June 25, 2019 Filing 36 SEALED DOCUMENT. (fjg)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) Order granting #31 motion for leave to file under seal. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 6/25/19.(zwt)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) Order granting #28 motion for extension of time to file response/reply re #16 motion to sever and compel arbitration or dismiss, #19 motion to dismiss, #7 motion to compel arbitration, #12 motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim. Replies due by 6/28/2019. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 6/25/19.(zwt)
June 25, 2019 Filing 33 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Empower Healthcare Solutions LLC (Waddell, William)
June 24, 2019 Filing 32 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Arkansas Total Care Inc, Centene Corporation (Reed, Winthrop)
June 20, 2019 Filing 31 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal by APC Passe LLC (Marts, Gary)
June 20, 2019 Filing 30 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #29 Motion to Compel Arbitration filed by APC Passe LLC. (Marts, Gary)
June 20, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION to Compel Motion to Compel Arbitration by APC Passe LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - to be filed under seal with leave of court)(Marts, Gary)
June 14, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Home to Community Living Inc (Gillham, Lucien)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #25 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #7 MOTION to Compel Arbitration. Replies due by 6/25/2019. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 6/12/19. (lp)
June 12, 2019 Filing 26 Deficiency Letter from Clerk of Court notifying party that #25 Motion for Extension of Time does not contain a statement that the movant contacted the adverse party with regard to the motion (Local Rule 6.2(b)). (jak)
June 11, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Defendant Empower Healthcare Solutions, LLC's Motion to Compel and to Stay Action by Home to Community Living Inc (Sutter, Luther)
June 11, 2019 Filing 24 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER:Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 8/1/2019. Rule 26(f) Report due by 8/15/2019. Jury Trial set for 8/3/2020 at 09:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 2D before Chief Judge Brian S. Miller. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 6/11/19. (lp)
June 3, 2019 Filing 23 SEALED EXHIBIT. (kdr)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) Order granting #18 motion for leave to file under seal. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 6/3/19. (zwt)
May 31, 2019 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Arkansas Total Care Inc, Centene Corporation of Exhibit C-1 to Motion to Sever and Compel Arbitration or Dismiss (Shults, Steven)
May 31, 2019 Filing 20 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #19 Motion to Dismiss filed by Arkansas Department of Human Services, Cindy Gillespie, Paula Stone. (Bird, William)
May 31, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss by Arkansas Department of Human Services, Cindy Gillespie, Paula Stone (Bird, William)
May 31, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal by Arkansas Total Care Inc, Centene Corporation (Shults, Steven)
May 31, 2019 Filing 17 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #16 Motion to Sever and Compel Arbitration or Dismiss filed by Arkansas Total Care Inc, Centene Corporation. (Shults, Steven)
May 31, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Sever and Compel Arbitration or Dismiss by Arkansas Total Care Inc, Centene Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Shults, Steven)
May 31, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by APC Passe LLC.(Marts, Gary)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 5/31/19. (lp)
May 31, 2019 Filing 13 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #12 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Optum Services Inc. (Grinder, Lauren)
May 31, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Optum Services Inc (Grinder, Lauren)
May 31, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Oliver Thomas. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3470034. Filed by Arkansas Total Care Inc, Centene Corporation (Shults, Steven)
May 30, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Winthrop Reed. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3469816. Filed by Arkansas Total Care Inc, Centene Corporation (Shults, Steven)
May 30, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Edward Pivin. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3469811. Filed by Arkansas Total Care Inc, Centene Corporation (Shults, Steven)
May 28, 2019 Filing 8 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #7 Motion to Compel Arbitration filed by Empower Healthcare Solutions LLC. (Waddell, William)
May 28, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Compel Arbitration by Empower Healthcare Solutions LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Nicole May)(Waddell, William)
May 28, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Empower Healthcare Solutions LLC.(Waddell, William)
May 24, 2019 Filing 5 CONSENT to Removal by Empower Healthcare Solutions LLC. (kdr)
May 24, 2019 Filing 4 RESPONSE to #3 MOTION to Transfer filed by Home to Community Living Inc. (kdr)
May 24, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Transfer by Arkansas Department of Human Services, Cindy Gillespie and Paula Stone. (kdr)
May 24, 2019 Filing 2 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Home to Community Living Inc.(kdr)
May 24, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by APC Passe LLC, Arkansas Total Care Inc, Centene Corporation and Optum Services Inc from Pulaski County Circuit Court, Case Number 60CV-19-2768. Fee of $400 paid. Receipt Number LIT072283. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Home to Community Living Inc v. Arkansas Department of Human Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Empower Healthcare Solutions LLC
Represented By: William A. Waddell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas Department of Human Services
Represented By: William C. Bird, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paula Stone
Represented By: William C. Bird, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas Total Care Inc
Represented By: Peter R. Shults
Represented By: Edward T. Pivin
Represented By: Oliver H. Thomas
Represented By:
Represented By:
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: APC Passe LLC
Represented By: Gary D. Marts, Jr.
Represented By: Jessica Pruitt Koehler
Represented By:
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cindy Gillespie
Represented By: William C. Bird, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Optum Services Inc
Represented By: Megan D. Hargraves
Represented By:
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centene Corporation
Represented By: Peter R. Shults
Represented By: Edward T. Pivin
Represented By: Oliver H. Thomas
Represented By:
Represented By:
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Home to Community Living Inc
Represented By: Luther Oneal Sutter
Represented By: Lucien Ramseur Gillham
Represented By:
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?