American Tiger Firearms LLC et al v. Facebook Inc et al
Plaintiff: First Shot LLC, American Tiger Firearms LLC and Farm Diva LLC
Defendant: Facebook Payments Inc and Facebook Inc
Case Number: 4:2019cv00388
Filed: June 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Billy Roy Wilson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER denying #13 Plaintiff's Motion to Remand. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 8/1/2019. (ljb)
July 29, 2019 Filing 24 SEALED DOCUMENT. (fjg)
July 29, 2019 Filing 23 SEALED RESPONSE. (fjg)
July 29, 2019 Filing 22 SEALED DOCUMENT. (fjg)
July 29, 2019 Filing 21 DECLARATION of Nicholas Wong by Facebook Inc, Facebook Payments Inc. re #20 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by Facebook Payments Inc, Facebook Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Ney, Marshall)
July 29, 2019 Filing 20 RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Facebook Inc, Facebook Payments Inc. (Ney, Marshall)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #18 Defendant's Motion to File Response Under Seal. However, if after reviewing the document I determine that it should not have been under seal or that a redacted version could have been done with little effort (I strongly encourage Defendant to consider this option again), I may unseal it or require Defendant to redact the alleged confidential portions. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 07/26/19. (dmm)
July 24, 2019 Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document (Response to Motion to Remand) by Facebook Inc, Facebook Payments Inc (Ney, Marshall)
July 11, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Change of Address by Facebook Inc, Facebook Payments Inc (Hartnett, Kathleen)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting in part and denying in part #15 the Joint Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand #13 . Accordingly, Defendants' response must be filed by 5 p.m., Monday, July 29, 2019. The request to file a reply is denied. If a reply is needed, I will request it. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 07/08/19. (dmm)
July 8, 2019 Filing 15 Joint MOTION to Extend Time for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiffs Motion to Remand and for Leave for Plaintiffs to File a Reply by Facebook Inc, Facebook Payments Inc (Ney, Marshall)
July 1, 2019 Filing 14 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #13 Remand to State Court filed by All Plaintiffs. (Creasman, William)
July 1, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Remand to State Court by All Plaintiffs (Creasman, William)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant(s) will have 15 days from the date of the Court's ruling on the forthcoming motion to remand to file an answer to the complaint. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 7/1/19. (mmb)
July 1, 2019 Filing 11 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint by Facebook Inc, Facebook Payments Inc (Ney, Marshall)
June 28, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION Further Extending Defendants' Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by Facebook Inc, Facebook Payments Inc. (Ney, Marshall)
June 11, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION Extending Defendants' Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by Facebook Inc, Facebook Payments Inc. (Ney, Marshall)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #3 and #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Accordingly, Kathleen R. Hartnett and Martha L. Goodman are admitted Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 6/7/19. (mmb)
June 7, 2019 Filing 7 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 8/14/2019. Rule 26(f) Report due by 8/28/2019. Jury Trial set for 6/16/2020 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # A401 before Judge Billy Roy Wilson. Entered at the direction of the Court on 6/7/19. (mmb)
June 6, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Henry Bates, III on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Bates, Joseph)
June 5, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Facebook Inc and Facebook Payments Inc. (ljb)
June 5, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Martha L. Goodman filed by All Defendants. Fee of $100 paid, Receipt #LIT072474. (ljb)
June 5, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Kathleen R. Hartnett filed by All Defendants. Fee of $100 paid, Receipt #LIT072474. (ljb)
June 5, 2019 Filing 2 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by All Plaintiffs. (ljb)
June 5, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Saline County Circuit Court, Case Number 63CV-19-505-3. Fee of $400 paid, Receipt #LIT072474. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ljb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Tiger Firearms LLC et al v. Facebook Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: First Shot LLC
Represented By: Joseph Henry Bates, III
Represented By: David Slade
Represented By: William P. Creasman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Tiger Firearms LLC
Represented By: Joseph Henry Bates, III
Represented By: David Slade
Represented By: William P. Creasman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Farm Diva LLC
Represented By: Joseph Henry Bates, III
Represented By: David Slade
Represented By: William P. Creasman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook Payments Inc
Represented By: Martha L. Goodman
Represented By: Kathleen R. Hartnett
Represented By: Marshall S. Ney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook Inc
Represented By: Martha L. Goodman
Represented By: Kathleen R. Hartnett
Represented By: Marshall S. Ney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?