Christian Ministerial Alliance et al v. Arkansas, State of et al
Plaintiff: Arkansas Community Institute, Christian Ministerial Alliance, Ryan Davis, Marion Humphrey, Olly Neal and Kymara Hill Seals
Defendant: Leslie Rutledge, Arkansas Board of Apportionment, John Thurston, Arkansas Board of Election Commissioners, Asa Hutchinson and Arkansas, State of
Case Number: 4:2019cv00402
Filed: June 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: James M Moody
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants have until August 19, 2019, to file a responsive pleading to Plaintiffs Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 7/22/19. (dpb)
July 18, 2019 Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #9 Amended Complaint, pursuant to Local Rule 6.2(a) for a Clerk's order extending time to file responsive pleading, Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time () by All Defendants (Wagner, Vincent)
July 18, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Vincent Moore Wagner on behalf of All Defendants (Wagner, Vincent)
July 12, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #15 Affidavit of Service. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to indicate the document was filed in error (duplicate entry) pursuant to instruction from the filing attorney. The correct document was previously filed as docket entry #13 . (jak)
July 12, 2019 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT of Service Arkansas Board of Election Commissioners, filed by Olly Neal, Christian Ministerial Alliance, Kymara Hill Seals, Ryan Davis, Arkansas Community Institute, Marion Humphrey. Arkansas Board of Election Commissioners served on 7/8/2019. (Byrd, Arkie)
July 12, 2019 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT of Service John Thurston, filed by Olly Neal, Christian Ministerial Alliance, Kymara Hill Seals, Ryan Davis, Arkansas Community Institute, Marion Humphrey. John Thurston served on 7/8/2019. (Byrd, Arkie)
July 12, 2019 Filing 15 DOCKET ENTRY FILED IN ERROR - DISREGARD (Byrd, Arkie) (Docket text modified on 7/12/2019 to indicate the document was filed in error) (jak)
July 12, 2019 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Service Leslie Rutledge, filed by Olly Neal, Christian Ministerial Alliance, Kymara Hill Seals, Ryan Davis, Arkansas Community Institute, Marion Humphrey. Leslie Rutledge served on 7/8/2019. (Byrd, Arkie)
July 12, 2019 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Original and Amended Complaint with Summons on Gov. Asa Hutchinson, filed by Olly Neal, Christian Ministerial Alliance, Kymara Hill Seals, Ryan Davis, Arkansas Community Institute, Marion Humphrey. All Plaintiffs. (Byrd, Arkie)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #11 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jon Weingart terminated. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 7/8/19. (dpb)
July 3, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Arkansas Community Institute, Christian Ministerial Alliance, Marion Humphrey, Olly Neal, Kymara Hill Seals (Weingart, Jon)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #2 , #3 , #4 , #5 , #6 , #7 , #8 motions to admit counsel pro hac vice on behalf of Plaintiffs. Natasha C. Merle, John Z. Morris, Kristen A. Johnson, Philip Urofsky, Timothy J. Slattery, Jonathan L. Greenblatt, and Jon Weingart are hereby admitted to appear before this Court as co-counsel of record in this action. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 6/25/2019. (jbh)
June 21, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Arkansas, State of, Asa Hutchinson, John Thurston, Leslie Rutledge, Arkansas Board of Election Commissioners, Arkansas Board of Apportionment filed by Christian Ministerial Alliance, Arkansas Community Institute, Marion Humphrey, Olly Neal, Kymara Hill Seals. Summons reissued as to all Defendants and returned to counsel for service. (fjg)
June 20, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Jon Weingart. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3483228. Filed by All Plaintiffs (Byrd, Arkie)
June 13, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Jonathan L. Greenblatt. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3479007. Filed by All Plaintiffs (Byrd, Arkie)
June 13, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Timothy J. Slattery. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3479003. Filed by All Plaintiffs (Byrd, Arkie)
June 13, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Philip Urofsky. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3478996. Filed by All Plaintiffs (Byrd, Arkie)
June 13, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Kristen A. Johnson. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3478994. Filed by All Plaintiffs (Byrd, Arkie)
June 13, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by John Z. Morris. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3478991. Filed by All Plaintiffs (Byrd, Arkie)
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Natasha C. Merle. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3478987. Filed by All Plaintiffs (Byrd, Arkie)
June 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by All Plaintiffs. Summons issued and returned to counsel. (Fee of $400 paid, Receipt #LIT072556.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ljb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Christian Ministerial Alliance et al v. Arkansas, State of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leslie Rutledge
Represented By: Vincent Moore Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas Board of Apportionment
Represented By: Vincent Moore Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Thurston
Represented By: Vincent Moore Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas Board of Election Commissioners
Represented By: Vincent Moore Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asa Hutchinson
Represented By: Vincent Moore Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas, State of
Represented By: Vincent Moore Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arkansas Community Institute
Represented By: Kristen A. Johnson
Represented By: Natasha C. Merle
Represented By: Jonathan Greenblatt
Represented By: Jon Weingart
Represented By: John Z. Morris
Represented By: Philip Urofsky
Represented By: Timothy Slattery
Represented By: Arkie Byrd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christian Ministerial Alliance
Represented By: Kristen A. Johnson
Represented By: Natasha C. Merle
Represented By: Jonathan Greenblatt
Represented By: Jon Weingart
Represented By: John Z. Morris
Represented By: Philip Urofsky
Represented By: Timothy Slattery
Represented By: Arkie Byrd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Davis
Represented By: Kristen A. Johnson
Represented By: Natasha C. Merle
Represented By: Jonathan Greenblatt
Represented By: Jon Weingart
Represented By: John Z. Morris
Represented By: Philip Urofsky
Represented By: Timothy Slattery
Represented By: Arkie Byrd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marion Humphrey
Represented By: Kristen A. Johnson
Represented By: Natasha C. Merle
Represented By: Jonathan Greenblatt
Represented By: Jon Weingart
Represented By: John Z. Morris
Represented By: Philip Urofsky
Represented By: Timothy Slattery
Represented By: Arkie Byrd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Olly Neal
Represented By: Kristen A. Johnson
Represented By: Natasha C. Merle
Represented By: Jonathan Greenblatt
Represented By: Jon Weingart
Represented By: John Z. Morris
Represented By: Philip Urofsky
Represented By: Timothy Slattery
Represented By: Arkie Byrd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kymara Hill Seals
Represented By: Kristen A. Johnson
Represented By: Natasha C. Merle
Represented By: Jonathan Greenblatt
Represented By: Jon Weingart
Represented By: John Z. Morris
Represented By: Philip Urofsky
Represented By: Timothy Slattery
Represented By: Arkie Byrd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?