Rodriguez v. Superior Real Estate Solutions LLC et al
Plaintiff: Albert Rodriguez
Defendant: Alvin Franks, Jr and Superior Real Estate Solutions LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00405
Filed: June 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: D P Marshall
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2019 Filing 5 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Report due by 9/20/2019. Bench Trial set for 2/8/2021 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom #1A before Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. Signed at the direction of the Court on 8/2/2019. (slb)
June 28, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Alvin Franks, Jr, Superior Real Estate Solutions LLC.(McGue, Clinton)
June 28, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Clinton D. McGue on behalf of All Defendants (McGue, Clinton)
June 25, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Albert Rodriguez. Alvin Franks, Jr served on 6/17/2019; Superior Real Estate Solutions LLC served on 6/17/2019. (Sanford, Joshua)
June 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT - COLLECTIVE ACTION against All Defendants, filed by Albert Rodriguez. Fee of $400 paid. Receipt Number LIT072577. Summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodriguez v. Superior Real Estate Solutions LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alvin Franks, Jr
Represented By: Clinton D. McGue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Superior Real Estate Solutions LLC
Represented By: Clinton D. McGue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert Rodriguez
Represented By: Stephen Rauls
Represented By: Joshua Sanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?