South Arkansas Developmental Center for Children and Families Inc et al v. Gillespie et al
Plaintiff: Charles Henderson, Pattillo Center School Inc, Deandre Sheppard, Perla Valencia, Elisha Sheppard, Wendy Easterling, Maria Hegwood, Mandy Watson, Rigo Valencia, Terran Henderson, CB King Memorial School Inc, Wilbert Easterling, South Arkansas Developmental Center for Children and Families Inc and Pattillo Center-School Inc
Defendant: Cindy Gillespie and Melissa Stone
Case Number: 4:2019cv00417
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Referring Judge: James M Moody
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 11, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION for Reconsideration of Preliminary Findings by CB King Memorial School Inc, Wendy Easterling, Wilbert Easterling, Maria Hegwood, Charles Henderson, Terran Henderson, Pattillo Center-School Inc, Deandre Sheppard, Elisha Sheppard, South Arkansas Developmental Center for Children and Families Inc, Perla Valencia, Rigo Valencia, Mandy Watson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Arkansas Medical Services Policy Manual)(Bowen, Martin)
July 26, 2019 Filing 26 Proposed Findings of Fact by CB King Memorial School Inc, Wendy Easterling, Wilbert Easterling, Maria Hegwood, Charles Henderson, Terran Henderson, Pattillo Center-School Inc, Deandre Sheppard, Elisha Sheppard, South Arkansas Developmental Center for Children and Families Inc, Mandy Watson(Bowen, Martin)
July 26, 2019 Filing 25 BRIEF filed by CB King Memorial School Inc, Wendy Easterling, Wilbert Easterling, Maria Hegwood, Charles Henderson, Terran Henderson, Pattillo Center-School Inc, Deandre Sheppard, Elisha Sheppard, South Arkansas Developmental Center for Children and Families Inc, Mandy Watson (Bowen, Martin)
July 26, 2019 Filing 24 RESPONSE in Opposition re #2 MOTION for Permanent Injunction Defendant's Post Hearing Brief (In Lieu of Closing) filed by All Defendants. (Rosen, Richard)
July 19, 2019 Filing 23 Witness and Exhibit List by all Defendants.(kog)
July 19, 2019 Filing 22 Witness and Exhibit List by all Plaintiffs. (kog)
July 18, 2019 Filing 21 CLERK'S MINUTES for proceedings held before Judge James M. Moody Jr.: MOTION HEARING (Day 2) held on 7/18/2019 re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiffs. Defendants rest; Court confers with counsel regarding briefing schedule; Parties to discuss and report back to Court on agreed schedule. Counsel for Plaintiffs - Martin Bowen; Counsel for Defendant - Richard Rosen (Court Reporter Karen Baker.) (kog)
July 17, 2019 Filing 20 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.)CLERK'S MINUTES for proceedings held before Judge James M. Moody Jr.:MOTION HEARING (Day 1) held on 7/17/2019 re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiffs. Hearing begins; argument from counsel; Plaintiffs rest. Counsel directed to report back on Thursday, July 18, 2019 at 8:30. Counsel for Plaintiffs - Martin Bowen; Counsel for Defendant - Richard Rosen (Court Reporter Karen Baker.) (kog)
July 12, 2019 Filing 19 RESPONSE to Motion re #17 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Bowen, Martin)
July 8, 2019 Filing 18 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #17 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by All Defendants. (Rosen, Richard)
July 8, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by All Defendants (Rosen, Richard)
July 8, 2019 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT of Service , filed by CB King Memorial School Inc, Charles Henderson, Maria Hegwood, Wilbert Easterling, Wendy Easterling, Terran Henderson, Pattillo Center-School Inc. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Bowen, Martin)
July 1, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Neil Rosen on behalf of All Defendants (Rosen, Richard)
July 1, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas Rudolph Windle on behalf of All Defendants (Windle, Nicholas)
July 1, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #2 MOTION for Permanent Injunction filed by All Defendants. (Windle, Nicholas)
June 24, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Hearing on #2 MOTION for Permanent Injunction : MOTION HEARING set for 7/17/2019 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 4A before Judge James M. Moody Jr. (kog)
June 20, 2019 Filing 11 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Based on #10 Order, the Clerk's office has reassigned the case to Judge James M. Moody Jr. (jak)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER directing the Clerk to reassign the above styled case, currently assigned to the docket of Judge Susan Webber Wright, due to her senior status. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 6/20/2019. (jbh)
June 20, 2019 Filing 9 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Based on 8 Order, the Clerk's office has reassigned the case to Judge Susan Webber Wright. (jak)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER of RECUSAL. I recuse because I am in trial out of district this week and next week and unable to handle the pending motion for injunctive relief. The Clerk of the Court is directed to reassign this case. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 6/20/19. (mmb)
June 20, 2019 Filing 7 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Based on #6 Order, the Clerk's office has reassigned the case to Judge Billy Roy Wilson. (jak)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT directing the Clerk's office to issue a Notice of Reassignment. Signed at the direction of the Court on 6/20/2019. (kdr)
June 20, 2019 Filing 5 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) MINUTES for proceedings held before Judge Kristine G. Baker:SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 6/20/2019. The parties convened via telephone to discuss scheduling of hearing; Upon disclosure of certain witness, the Court determined that she needed to recuse; An order will be entered. (Present for plaintiff: Martin Bowen, Present for defendants: Rich Rosen, Jim Braden, and David Sterling) (Court Reporter Elaine Hinson) (tmw)
June 20, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 6/20/2019 at 01:00 PM before Judge Kristine G. Baker. (tmw)
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR TEMPORARY, PRELIMINARY, AND PERMANENT INJUNCTIVE RELIEF filed by All Plaintiffs. (jbh)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION FOR TEMPORARY, PRELIMINARY, AND PERMANENT INJUNCTIVE RELIEF by All Plaintiffs. (jbh)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by All Plaintiffs. Summons issued and returned to counsel. (Fee of $400 paid. Receipt Number LIT072600.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jbh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: South Arkansas Developmental Center for Children and Families Inc et al v. Gillespie et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Henderson
Represented By: Martin Wayne Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pattillo Center School Inc
Represented By: Martin Wayne Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deandre Sheppard
Represented By: Martin Wayne Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Perla Valencia
Represented By: Martin Wayne Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elisha Sheppard
Represented By: Martin Wayne Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendy Easterling
Represented By: Martin Wayne Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Hegwood
Represented By: Martin Wayne Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mandy Watson
Represented By: Martin Wayne Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rigo Valencia
Represented By: Martin Wayne Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terran Henderson
Represented By: Martin Wayne Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CB King Memorial School Inc
Represented By: Martin Wayne Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilbert Easterling
Represented By: Martin Wayne Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: South Arkansas Developmental Center for Children and Families Inc
Represented By: Martin Wayne Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pattillo Center-School Inc
Represented By: Martin Wayne Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cindy Gillespie
Represented By: Richard Neil Rosen
Represented By: Nicholas Rudolph Windle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa Stone
Represented By: Richard Neil Rosen
Represented By: Nicholas Rudolph Windle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?